This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 11:47:29 (UTC).

LANCE B. KENNEDY VS. JANEEN A. COCHRAN

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 LANCE B KENNEDY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JANEEN A COCHRAN. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LANCE B. KENNEDY

TIMOTHY MURRIETA

BENJAMIN D. BEARD

Defendants

JANEEN A. COCHRAN

JENNIFER L. SHAW

VILLA REAL ESTATE

PETER J. COCHRAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MUZI & ASSOCIATES

Defendant Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF JOSEPH DI GIULIO

SNELL & WILMER, L.L.P.

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY KENNEDY, LANCE B.; MURRIETA, TIMOTHY; BEARD, BENJAMIN D. ON 05/31/2016

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY KENNEDY, LANCE B.; MURRIETA, TIMOTHY; BEARD, BENJAMIN D. ON 05/31/2016

ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY COCHRAN, JANEEN A.; COCHRAN, PETER J. ON 12/15/2016

ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY COCHRAN, JANEEN A.; COCHRAN, PETER J. ON 12/15/2016

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY KENNEDY, LANCE B.; MURRIETA, TIMOTHY; BEARD, BENJAMIN D. ON 03/07/2017

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY KENNEDY, LANCE B.; MURRIETA, TIMOTHY; BEARD, BENJAMIN D. ON 03/07/2017

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY KENNEDY, LANCE B.; MURRIETA, TIMOTHY; BEARD, BENJAMIN D. ON 10/20/2016

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY KENNEDY, LANCE B.; MURRIETA, TIMOTHY; BEARD, BENJAMIN D. ON 10/20/2016

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION 07/28/2016 01:30:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION 07/28/2016 01:30:00 PM.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11928248 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11752466.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11928248 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11752466.

NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY KENNEDY, LANCE B.; MURRIETA, TIMOTHY; BEARD, BENJAMIN D. ON 03/22/2016

NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY KENNEDY, LANCE B.; MURRIETA, TIMOTHY; BEARD, BENJAMIN D. ON 03/22/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12046611 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11870556.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12046611 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11870556.

OPPOSITION FILED BY COCHRAN, JANEEN A.; COCHRAN, PETER J. ON 10/28/2016

OPPOSITION FILED BY COCHRAN, JANEEN A.; COCHRAN, PETER J. ON 10/28/2016

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 10/17/2016

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 10/17/2016

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE RE: ADR 01/31/2017 08:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE RE: ADR 01/31/2017 08:30:00 AM.

REPLY TO OPPOSITION FILED BY COCHRAN, JANEEN A.; COCHRAN, PETER J. ON 07/19/2016

REPLY TO OPPOSITION FILED BY COCHRAN, JANEEN A.; COCHRAN, PETER J. ON 07/19/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 37 - MOTION/NOTICE TO CONTINUE HEARING OR CMC IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12100788 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11924704.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 37 - MOTION/NOTICE TO CONTINUE HEARING OR CMC IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12100788 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11924704.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 10/18/2016 08:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 10/18/2016 08:30:00 AM.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER CRANDALL, JAMES ON 02/26/2016.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER CRANDALL, JAMES ON 02/26/2016.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 870.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11951203 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11775368.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 870.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11951203 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11775368.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY KENNEDY, LANCE B.; MURRIETA, TIMOTHY; BEARD, BENJAMIN D. ON 02/26/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY KENNEDY, LANCE B.; MURRIETA, TIMOTHY; BEARD, BENJAMIN D. ON 02/26/2016

REPLY TO OPPOSITION FILED BY KENNEDY, LANCE B.; MURRIETA, TIMOTHY; BEARD, BENJAMIN D. ON 11/03/2016

REPLY TO OPPOSITION FILED BY KENNEDY, LANCE B.; MURRIETA, TIMOTHY; BEARD, BENJAMIN D. ON 11/03/2016

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2017
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY KENNEDY, LANCE B.; MURRIETA, TIMOTHY; BEARD, BENJAMIN D. ON 03/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2536213 RECEIVED ON 03/07/2017 09:51:24 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 37 - MOTION/NOTICE TO CONTINUE HEARING OR CMC IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12100788 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11924704.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FILED BY KENNEDY, LANCE B.; MURRIETA, TIMOTHY; BEARD, BENJAMIN D. ON 01/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1366279 RECEIVED ON 01/31/2017 03:09:39 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE RE: ADR 01/31/2017 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE RE: ADR CONTINUED TO 05/17/2017 AT 08:30 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE RE: ADR SCHEDULED FOR 05/17/2017 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C33 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
58 More Docket Entries
  • 03/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY KENNEDY, LANCE B.; MURRIETA, TIMOTHY; BEARD, BENJAMIN D. ON 03/21/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY KENNEDY, LANCE B.; MURRIETA, TIMOTHY; BEARD, BENJAMIN D. ON 03/21/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4520172 RECEIVED ON 03/21/2016 11:35:39 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/01/2016 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C33 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER CRANDALL, JAMES ON 02/26/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11928248 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11752466.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY KENNEDY, LANCE B.; MURRIETA, TIMOTHY; BEARD, BENJAMIN D. ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY KENNEDY, LANCE B.; MURRIETA, TIMOTHY; BEARD, BENJAMIN D. ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY KENNEDY, LANCE B.; MURRIETA, TIMOTHY; BEARD, BENJAMIN D. ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4509860 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 04:18:36 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less