This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 03/07/2021 at 11:26:05 (UTC).

LANCE AND CHRISTINE ANDERSON, TRUSTEES OF THE ANDERSON LIVING TRUST, ESTABLISHED JANUARY 9, 2007 VS. CYBERTECH CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC.

Case Summary

On 09/09/2019 LANCE AND CHRISTINE ANDERSON, TRUSTEES OF THE ANDERSON LIVING TRUST, ESTABLISHED JANUARY 9, 2007 filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against CYBERTECH CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LANCE AND CHRISTINE ANDERSON, TRUSTEES

Lance and Christine Anderson, Trustees of The Anderson Living Trust, established January 9, 2007

Lance Anderson

Defendants, Others and Cross Defendants

Cybertech Construction Company, Inc.

Amin Mirhadi

Mehrdad Farkhan

Daniel Christopher Kwock

tara ellen foster-shapiro

real estate of the pacific, inc

Capo Fireside

Ben Castro Masonry, Inc.

DLS Heating & Air Conditioning, Inc.

J.L. Ray Company, Inc.

Crown Garage Door & Gates, Inc.

Start to Finish Construction

Greg Pautsch Building, Inc.

First Class Glass, Inc.

Victoria's Kitchen LLC

Willhoit Builders, Inc.

Daniel Kwock

10 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Newmeyer & Dillion LLP

Defendant, Other and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Hall Griffin LLP

Meyers Fozi & Dwork, LLP

Baker & McKenzie LLP

Springel & Fink LLP

Andrews & Rhodes LLP

Jeffery & Grosfeld, LLP

Other Attorneys

Mokri Vanis & Jones, LLP

Manning & Kass Ellrod, Ramirez, Trester LLP

 

Court Documents

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY BEN CASTRO MASONRY, INC. ON 09/21/2020

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY BEN CASTRO MASONRY, INC. ON 09/21/2020

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY BEN CASTRO MASONRY, INC. ON 09/21/2020

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY BEN CASTRO MASONRY, INC. ON 09/21/2020

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE 06/03/2020 11:19:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE 06/03/2020 11:19:00 AM.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY FARKHAN, MEHRDAD ON 02/11/2020

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY FARKHAN, MEHRDAD ON 02/11/2020

OPPOSITION FILED BY LANCE AND CHRISTINE ANDERSON, TRUSTEES OF THE ANDERSON LIVING TRUST, ESTABLISHED JANUARY 9, 2007 ON 12/02/2019

OPPOSITION FILED BY LANCE AND CHRISTINE ANDERSON, TRUSTEES OF THE ANDERSON LIVING TRUST, ESTABLISHED JANUARY 9, 2007 ON 12/02/2019

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY FARKHAN, MEHRDAD; CYBERTECH CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC. ON 11/20/2019

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY FARKHAN, MEHRDAD; CYBERTECH CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC. ON 11/20/2019

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY FARKHAN, MEHRDAD; CYBERTECH CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC. ON 11/20/2019

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY FARKHAN, MEHRDAD; CYBERTECH CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC. ON 11/20/2019

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY MIRHADI, AMIN ON 11/06/2019

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY MIRHADI, AMIN ON 11/06/2019

COMPLAINT FILED BY LANCE AND CHRISTINE ANDERSON, TRUSTEES OF THE ANDERSON LIVING TRUST, ESTABLISHED JANUARY 9, 2007 ON 09/09/2019

COMPLAINT FILED BY LANCE AND CHRISTINE ANDERSON, TRUSTEES OF THE ANDERSON LIVING TRUST, ESTABLISHED JANUARY 9, 2007 ON 09/09/2019

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY NATIONWIDE FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12845161 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12672719.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY NATIONWIDE FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12845161 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12672719.

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY KWOCK, DANIEL C. ON 12/16/2020

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY KWOCK, DANIEL C. ON 12/16/2020

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY KWOCK, DANIEL C. ON 12/16/2020

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY KWOCK, DANIEL C. ON 12/16/2020

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2963878 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2963878 REJECTED.

AMENDMENT TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY MIRHADI, AMIN ON 06/12/2020

AMENDMENT TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY MIRHADI, AMIN ON 06/12/2020

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FILED BY LANCE AND CHRISTINE ANDERSON, TRUSTEES OF THE ANDERSON LIVING TRUST, ESTABLISHED JANUARY 9, 2007 ON 06/03/2020

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FILED BY LANCE AND CHRISTINE ANDERSON, TRUSTEES OF THE ANDERSON LIVING TRUST, ESTABLISHED JANUARY 9, 2007 ON 06/03/2020

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12715234 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12540668.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12715234 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12540668.

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY MIRHADI, AMIN ON 01/21/2020

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY MIRHADI, AMIN ON 01/21/2020

NOTICE OF MOTION FILED BY MIRHADI, AMIN ON 11/06/2019

NOTICE OF MOTION FILED BY MIRHADI, AMIN ON 11/06/2019

173 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2021
  • HearingDescription: STATUS CONFERENCE; Judge: HOWARD; Department: C18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • HearingDescription: DEMURRER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT; Judge: HOWARD; Department: C18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • HearingDescription: MOTION TO STRIKE COMPLAINT; Judge: HOWARD; Department: C18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • HearingDescription: DEMURRER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT; Judge: HOWARD; Department: C18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • HearingDescription: MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF CROSS-COMPLAINT; Judge: HOWARD; Department: C18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • HearingDescription: DEMURRER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT; Judge: HOWARD; Department: C18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • HearingDescription: MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION; Judge: HOWARD; Department: C18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12851858 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12679543.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1807534 RECEIVED ON 01/28/2021 01:29:58 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41163803 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
275 More Docket Entries
  • 10/09/2019
  • DocketTHIS CASE IS REASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE ROBERT J. MOSS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • DocketCASE REASSIGNED TO ROBERT MOSS EFFECTIVE 10/09/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR 10/07/2019 04:20:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 34 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - PLAINTIFF IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12617565 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12442064.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2835613 RECEIVED ON 09/09/2019 04:12:15 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER WILSON, PETER ON 09/09/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY LANCE AND CHRISTINE ANDERSON, TRUSTEES OF THE ANDERSON LIVING TRUST, ESTABLISHED JANUARY 9, 2007 ON 09/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY LANCE AND CHRISTINE ANDERSON, TRUSTEES OF THE ANDERSON LIVING TRUST, ESTABLISHED JANUARY 9, 2007 ON 09/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY LANCE AND CHRISTINE ANDERSON, TRUSTEES OF THE ANDERSON LIVING TRUST, ESTABLISHED JANUARY 9, 2007 ON 09/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Willhoit Builders, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where First Class Glass, Inc. is a litigant