This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 10/02/2021 at 14:48:59 (UTC).

LAM - ASSISTED OUTPATIENT TREATMENT

Case Summary

On 07/20/2021 LAM - ASSISTED OUTPATIENT TREATMENT was filed as a Probate - Mental Health lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Mental Health

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ORANGE COUNTY HEALTHCARE AGENCY/BEHAVIORAL HEALTH SERVICES

Respondent

JENNIFER LAM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

COUNTY COUNSEL

Respondent Attorney

PUBLIC DEFENDER

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR MENTAL HEALTH HEARING 09/21/2021 09:00:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR ORDER FOR ASSISTED OUTPATIENT TREATMENT FILED BY ORANGE COUNTY HEALTHCARE AGENCY IS DISMISSED AT THE REQUEST OF THE PETITIONER.; Filing Party: ORANGE COUNTY HEALTHCARE AGENCY IS DISMISSED AT THE REQUEST OF THE PETITIONER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketMENTAL HEALTH HEARING CONTINUED TO 09/21/2021 AT 09:00 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER DATED 08/10/2021 CORRECTED NUNC PRO TUNC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketMENTAL HEALTH HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 09/21/2021 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C09 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR NUNC PRO TUNC MINUTES 08/10/2021 01:20:00 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketMENTAL HEALTH HEARING CONTINUED TO 08/31/2021 AT 09:00 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketMENTAL HEALTH HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 08/31/2021 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C09 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR MENTAL HEALTH HEARING 08/10/2021 09:00:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41220773 RECEIVED ON 07/26/2021 07:24:51 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketPROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY ORANGE COUNTY HEALTHCARE AGENCY/BEHAVIORAL HEALTH SERVICES ON 07/26/2021; Filing Party: ORANGE COUNTY HEALTHCARE AGENCY/BEHAVIORAL HEALTH SERVICES ON 07/26/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketPLAN FOR ASSISTED OUTPATIENT TREATMENT FILED BY ORANGE COUNTY HEALTHCARE AGENCY/BEHAVIORAL HEALTH SERVICES ON 07/26/2021; Filing Party: ORANGE COUNTY HEALTHCARE AGENCY/BEHAVIORAL HEALTH SERVICES ON 07/26/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1874431 RECEIVED ON 07/26/2021 07:16:49 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketORDER - OTHER (ORDER APPOINTING THE ORANGE COUNTY PUBLIC DEFENDER AND AUTHORIZING ACCESS TO/COPIES OF MEDICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH INFORMATION) FILED BY LAM, JENNIFER ON 07/21/2021; Filing Party: LAM, JENNIFER ON 07/21/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31041144 RECEIVED ON 07/21/2021 08:30:22 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY ORANGE COUNTY HEALTHCARE AGENCY/BEHAVIORAL HEALTH SERVICES ON 07/21/2021; Filing Party: ORANGE COUNTY HEALTHCARE AGENCY/BEHAVIORAL HEALTH SERVICES ON 07/21/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketMENTAL HEALTH HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 07/27/2021 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C09 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31040586 RECEIVED ON 07/20/2021 07:25:13 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketDECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF PETITION FOR ORDER FOR ASSISTED OUTPATIENT TREATMENT FILED BY ORANGE COUNTY HEALTHCARE AGENCY/BEHAVIORAL HEALTH SERVICES ON 07/20/2021; Filing Party: ORANGE COUNTY HEALTHCARE AGENCY/BEHAVIORAL HEALTH SERVICES ON 07/20/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR ORDER FOR ASSISTED OUTPATIENT TREATMENT FILED BY ORANGE COUNTY HEALTHCARE AGENCY/BEHAVIORAL HEALTH SERVICES ON 07/20/2021; Filing Party: ORANGE COUNTY HEALTHCARE AGENCY/BEHAVIORAL HEALTH SERVICES ON 07/20/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less