This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/19/2017 at 04:50:25 (UTC).

LADERA RANCH MAINTENANCE CORPORATION VS. LEROY LAVI

Case Summary

On 09/04/2014 LADERA RANCH MAINTENANCE CORPORATION filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against LEROY LAVI. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    09/04/2014

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LADERA RANCH MAINTENANCE CORPORATION

Defendant

LEROY LAVI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NEULAND, WHITNEY & MICHAEL, APC

Defendant Attorney

KEVIN D. GAMARNIK

 

Court Documents

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES 03/20/2015 09:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES 03/20/2015 09:30:00 AM.

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY LAVI, LEROY ON 03/12/2015

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY LAVI, LEROY ON 03/12/2015

NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION FILED BY LAVI, LEROY ON 03/12/2015

NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION FILED BY LAVI, LEROY ON 03/12/2015

OPPOSITION FILED BY LADERA RANCH MAINTENANCE CORPORATION ON 03/09/2015

OPPOSITION FILED BY LADERA RANCH MAINTENANCE CORPORATION ON 03/09/2015

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED BY LADERA RANCH MAINTENANCE CORPORATION ON 02/26/2015

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED BY LADERA RANCH MAINTENANCE CORPORATION ON 02/26/2015

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11742474 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11566665.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11742474 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11566665.

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY LAVI, LEROY ON 02/24/2015

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY LAVI, LEROY ON 02/24/2015

MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES FILED BY LAVI, LEROY ON 02/24/2015

MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES FILED BY LAVI, LEROY ON 02/24/2015

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (SUMMARY) FILED BY LAVI, LEROY ON 02/24/2015

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (SUMMARY) FILED BY LAVI, LEROY ON 02/24/2015

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY LADERA RANCH MAINTENANCE CORPORATION ON 02/17/2015

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY LADERA RANCH MAINTENANCE CORPORATION ON 02/17/2015

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED BY LADERA RANCH MAINTENANCE CORPORATION ON 02/13/2015

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED BY LADERA RANCH MAINTENANCE CORPORATION ON 02/13/2015

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 02/06/2015 09:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 02/06/2015 09:30:00 AM.

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY LAVI, LEROY ON 02/06/2015

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY LAVI, LEROY ON 02/06/2015

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 02/04/2015 08:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 02/04/2015 08:30:00 AM.

REPLY - OTHER FILED BY LAVI, LEROY ON 01/30/2015

REPLY - OTHER FILED BY LAVI, LEROY ON 01/30/2015

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY LADERA RANCH MAINTENANCE CORPORATION ON 01/26/2015

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY LADERA RANCH MAINTENANCE CORPORATION ON 01/26/2015

OPPOSITION FILED BY LADERA RANCH MAINTENANCE CORPORATION ON 01/26/2015

OPPOSITION FILED BY LADERA RANCH MAINTENANCE CORPORATION ON 01/26/2015

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY LAVI, LEROY ON 01/23/2015

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY LAVI, LEROY ON 01/23/2015

38 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES 03/20/2015 09:30:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - OTHER FILED BY LAVI, LEROY ON 03/12/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2015
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 4343503 RECEIVED ON 03/12/2015 04:27:49 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION FILED BY LAVI, LEROY ON 03/12/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2015
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3263545 RECEIVED ON 03/12/2015 04:23:29 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOPPOSITION FILED BY LADERA RANCH MAINTENANCE CORPORATION ON 03/09/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2015
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1237738 RECEIVED ON 03/09/2015 10:15:47 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED BY LADERA RANCH MAINTENANCE CORPORATION ON 02/26/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2015
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3257209 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2015 03:11:52 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2015
  • DocketMOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES SCHEDULED FOR 03/20/2015 AT 09:30:00 AM IN C20 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
66 More Docket Entries
  • 09/17/2014
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1189652 RECEIVED ON 09/08/2014 05:09:57 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY LADERA RANCH MAINTENANCE CORPORATION ON 09/05/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2014
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3186922 RECEIVED ON 09/05/2014 01:40:55 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER MILLER, FRANZ ON 09/04/2014.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11653703 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11477806.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE - OTHER FILED BY LADERA RANCH MAINTENANCE CORPORATION ON 09/04/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED BY LADERA RANCH MAINTENANCE CORPORATION ON 09/04/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY LADERA RANCH MAINTENANCE CORPORATION ON 09/04/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY LADERA RANCH MAINTENANCE CORPORATION ON 09/04/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2014
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2365464 RECEIVED ON 09/04/2014 03:41:23 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less