Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 12/29/2019 at 06:42:15 (UTC).

LACEY QUINN VS. INFINITY DATA NETWORKS, INC.

Case Summary

On 10/16/2019 LACEY QUINN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against INFINITY DATA NETWORKS, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    10/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Erica Hansson

Lacey Quinn

Defendants

Samantha Whitlock

Infinity Data Networks, Inc.

Alex E. Rodriguez

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

The Vanderpool Law Firm

 

Court Documents

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 03/13/2020 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C12 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 03/13/2020 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C12 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER MELZER, LAYNE ON 10/16/2019.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER MELZER, LAYNE ON 10/16/2019.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12640715 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12465236.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12640715 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12465236.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY QUINN, LACEY; HANSSON, ERICA ON 10/16/2019

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY QUINN, LACEY; HANSSON, ERICA ON 10/16/2019

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY QUINN, LACEY; HANSSON, ERICA ON 10/16/2019

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY QUINN, LACEY; HANSSON, ERICA ON 10/16/2019

COMPLAINT FILED BY QUINN, LACEY; HANSSON, ERICA ON 10/16/2019

COMPLAINT FILED BY QUINN, LACEY; HANSSON, ERICA ON 10/16/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 03/13/2020 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C12 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER MELZER, LAYNE ON 10/16/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12640715 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12465236.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY QUINN, LACEY; HANSSON, ERICA ON 10/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY QUINN, LACEY; HANSSON, ERICA ON 10/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY QUINN, LACEY; HANSSON, ERICA ON 10/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2849159 RECEIVED ON 10/16/2019 01:33:32 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INFINITY DATA NETWORKS INC. DBA INFINITY GENERAL CONTRACTORS GROUP A CORPORATION is a litigant