This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 02/13/2022 at 03:37:15 (UTC).

LA SHON HODGE VS. WINDSTONE HEALTH SERVICES, INC.

Case Summary

On 01/29/2021 LA SHON HODGE filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against WINDSTONE HEALTH SERVICES, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, West Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-WJC

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

La Shon Hodge

Defendants

Melinda Jimenez

Keba Parker

Windstone Health Services, Inc.

Peter Davidson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Wilshire Law Firm

Defendant Attorney

Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, LLP

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF RELOCATION

NOTICE OF RELOCATION

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 07/23/2021 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 07/23/2021 09:00:00 AM.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PARKER, KEBA ON 07/21/2021

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PARKER, KEBA ON 07/21/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12910375 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12738236.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12910375 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12738236.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY HODGE, LA SHON ON 07/08/2021

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY HODGE, LA SHON ON 07/08/2021

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY HODGE, LA SHON ON 07/08/2021

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY HODGE, LA SHON ON 07/08/2021

NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY HODGE, LA SHON ON 06/08/2021

NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY HODGE, LA SHON ON 06/08/2021

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 07/23/2021 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C19 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 07/23/2021 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C19 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,740.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12876265 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12704004

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,740.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12876265 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12704004.

ANSWER (GENERAL DENIAL) FILED BY PARKER, KEBA; WINDSTONE HEALTH SERVICES, INC.; DAVIDSON, PETER; JIMENEZ, MELINDA ON 04/13/2021

ANSWER (GENERAL DENIAL) FILED BY PARKER, KEBA; WINDSTONE HEALTH SERVICES, INC.; DAVIDSON, PETER; JIMENEZ, MELINDA ON 04/13/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY HODGE, LA SHON ON 03/03/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY HODGE, LA SHON ON 03/03/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY HODGE, LA SHON ON 03/03/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY HODGE, LA SHON ON 03/03/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY HODGE, LA SHON ON 03/01/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY HODGE, LA SHON ON 03/01/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY HODGE, LA SHON ON 03/01/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY HODGE, LA SHON ON 03/01/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY HODGE, LA SHON ON 02/22/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY HODGE, LA SHON ON 02/22/2021

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3981718 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3981718 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3979569 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3979569 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2981189 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2981189 REJECTED.

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2022
  • HearingDescription: JURY TRIAL; Judge: SCHWARM; Department: W08

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • HearingDescription: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: SCHWARM; Department: W08

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELOCATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 07/23/2021 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketTHE MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR 06/17/2022 AT 08:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT C19.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketTHE JURY TRIAL IS SCHEDULED FOR 07/22/2022 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT C19.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketMANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/17/2022 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C19 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketJURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 07/22/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C19 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PARKER, KEBA ON 07/21/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1873137 RECEIVED ON 07/21/2021 02:38:17 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY HODGE, LA SHON ON 02/22/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3981718 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3979569 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2981189 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2980052 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12839001 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12666500.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1808121 RECEIVED ON 01/29/2021 04:43:02 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SCHWARM, WALTER ON 01/29/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY HODGE, LA SHON ON 01/29/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY HODGE, LA SHON ON 01/29/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Windstone Health Services, Inc. is a litigant