This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 05/27/2017 at 02:05:58 (UTC).

L.A. COMMERCIAL GROUP, INC. VS. LASER EYE CENTER OF CALIFORNIA LLC

Case Summary

On 11/05/2013 L A COMMERCIAL GROUP, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against LASER EYE CENTER OF CALIFORNIA LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Cross Defendants and Plaintiffs

L.A. COMMERCIAL GROUP, INC.

AMO SALES AND SERVICE INC

Other and Defendant

LASER EYE CARE OF CALIFORNIA LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Cross Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

WINSTON & STRAWN LLP

ERIN R. RANAHAN

Other and Defendant Attorney

STRAGGAS & ASSOCIATES

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY LASER EYE CARE OF CALIFORNIA LLC ON 05/28/2015

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY LASER EYE CARE OF CALIFORNIA LLC ON 05/28/2015

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY L.A. COMMERCIAL GROUP, INC. ON 05/21/2015

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY L.A. COMMERCIAL GROUP, INC. ON 05/21/2015

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3288927 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3288927 REJECTED.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY L.A. COMMERCIAL GROUP, INC. ON 02/10/2015

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY L.A. COMMERCIAL GROUP, INC. ON 02/10/2015

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY AMO SALES AND SERVICE INC ON 02/19/2015

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY AMO SALES AND SERVICE INC ON 02/19/2015

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11737589 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11561812.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11737589 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11561812.

STIPULATION AND ORDER (TO SUBSTITUTE REAL PARTIES IN INTEREST AND CHANGE PLAINTIFF'S NAME) FILED BY AMO SALES AND SERVICE INC ON 02/11/2015

STIPULATION AND ORDER (TO SUBSTITUTE REAL PARTIES IN INTEREST AND CHANGE PLAINTIFF'S NAME) FILED BY AMO SALES AND SERVICE INC ON 02/11/2015

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 02/10/2015

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 02/10/2015

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY AMO SALES AND SERVICE INC ON 12/18/2014

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY AMO SALES AND SERVICE INC ON 12/18/2014

ANSWER TO AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY AMO SALES AND SERVICE INC ON 12/18/2014

ANSWER TO AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY AMO SALES AND SERVICE INC ON 12/18/2014

NOTICE - OTHER (OF MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND TRIAL) FILED BY L.A. COMMERCIAL GROUP, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 12/05/2014

NOTICE - OTHER (OF MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND TRIAL) FILED BY L.A. COMMERCIAL GROUP, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 12/05/2014

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3199466 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3199466 REJECTED.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL OC GENERATED

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL OC GENERATED

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 12/01/2014 01:30:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 12/01/2014 01:30:00 PM.

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY AMO SALES AND SERVICE INC ON 11/20/2014

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY AMO SALES AND SERVICE INC ON 11/20/2014

REPLY - OTHER FILED BY AMO SALES AND SERVICE INC ON 11/20/2014

REPLY - OTHER FILED BY AMO SALES AND SERVICE INC ON 11/20/2014

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY LASER EYE CARE OF CALIFORNIA LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY ON 11/14/2014

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY LASER EYE CARE OF CALIFORNIA LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY ON 11/14/2014

OPPOSITION FILED BY LASER EYE CARE OF CALIFORNIA LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY ON 11/14/2014

OPPOSITION FILED BY LASER EYE CARE OF CALIFORNIA LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY ON 11/14/2014

73 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY LASER EYE CARE OF CALIFORNIA LLC ON 05/28/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2015
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1260485 RECEIVED ON 05/28/2015 12:17:13 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2015
  • DocketCASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2015
  • DocketCOMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2015
  • DocketAMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY L.A. COMMERCIAL GROUP, INC. ON 05/21/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2015
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3290313 RECEIVED ON 05/21/2015 09:17:57 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3288927 REJECTED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY L.A. COMMERCIAL GROUP, INC. ON 02/10/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2015
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 4325742 RECEIVED ON 02/10/2015 01:02:58 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
133 More Docket Entries
  • 12/16/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 05/12/2014 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C32 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2013
  • DocketSURETY NOT IN GOOD STANDING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY L.A. COMMERCIAL GROUP, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 11/21/2013

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2013
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 4111139 RECEIVED ON 11/21/2013 03:18:25 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER GLASS, GEOFFREY ON 11/05/2013.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11492385 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11316297.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY L.A. COMMERCIAL GROUP, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 11/05/2013

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY L.A. COMMERCIAL GROUP, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 11/05/2013

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY L.A. COMMERCIAL GROUP, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 11/05/2013

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2013
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 4102933 RECEIVED ON 11/05/2013 06:42:13 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less