This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 06/07/2017 at 09:26:58 (UTC).

KYLE VARGA VS. ADRIAN VALENZUELA

Case Summary

On 01/22/2015 KYLE VARGA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ADRIAN VALENZUELA. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2015

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KYLE VARGA

DREYER BABICH BUCCOLA WOOD CAMPORA, LLP

Defendant

ADRIAN VALENZUELA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DREYER BABICH BUCCOLA WOOD CAMPORA, LLP

Defendant Attorney

LAW OFFICE OF STEVEN D. LEVINE

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY VARGA, KYLE ON 06/24/2016

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY VARGA, KYLE ON 06/24/2016

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4565784 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4565784 REJECTED.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL 06/24/2016 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL 06/24/2016 09:00:00 AM.

PROPOSED ORDER (NOT SIGNED) FILED BY VALENZUELA, ADRIAN ON 06/13/2016

PROPOSED ORDER (NOT SIGNED) FILED BY VALENZUELA, ADRIAN ON 06/13/2016

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 06/06/2016 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 06/06/2016 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 06/03/2016 08:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 06/03/2016 08:30:00 AM.

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION FILED BY VARGA, KYLE ON 06/02/2016

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION FILED BY VARGA, KYLE ON 06/02/2016

OPPOSITION FILED BY VARGA, KYLE ON 06/02/2016

OPPOSITION FILED BY VARGA, KYLE ON 06/02/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING, 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 120.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11977032 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11801161.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING, 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 120.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11977032 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11801161.

JURY INSTRUCTIONS FILED BY VARGA, KYLE ON 06/02/2016

JURY INSTRUCTIONS FILED BY VARGA, KYLE ON 06/02/2016

VERDICT (SPECIAL) RECEIVED ON 06/02/2016.

VERDICT (SPECIAL) RECEIVED ON 06/02/2016.

EXHIBIT LIST FILED BY VARGA, KYLE ON 06/02/2016

EXHIBIT LIST FILED BY VARGA, KYLE ON 06/02/2016

STATEMENT OF CONTROVERTED ISSUES FILED BY VARGA, KYLE ON 06/02/2016

STATEMENT OF CONTROVERTED ISSUES FILED BY VARGA, KYLE ON 06/02/2016

JURY INSTRUCTIONS FILED BY VARGA, KYLE ON 06/02/2016

JURY INSTRUCTIONS FILED BY VARGA, KYLE ON 06/02/2016

WITNESS LIST FILED BY VARGA, KYLE ON 06/02/2016

WITNESS LIST FILED BY VARGA, KYLE ON 06/02/2016

STATEMENT OF CASE FILED BY VARGA, KYLE ON 06/02/2016

STATEMENT OF CASE FILED BY VARGA, KYLE ON 06/02/2016

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY VARGA, KYLE ON 06/02/2016

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY VARGA, KYLE ON 06/02/2016

MOTION IN LIMINE (14) FILED BY VARGA, KYLE ON 06/02/2016

MOTION IN LIMINE (14) FILED BY VARGA, KYLE ON 06/02/2016

88 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2016
  • DocketCASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2016
  • DocketCOMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY VARGA, KYLE ON 06/24/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2016
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3428290 RECEIVED ON 06/24/2016 09:50:36 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4565784 REJECTED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL 06/24/2016 09:00:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED ORDER (NOT SIGNED) FILED BY VALENZUELA, ADRIAN ON 06/13/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2016
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2467405 RECEIVED ON 06/02/2016 10:26:34 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 06/06/2016 09:00:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • DocketTHE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL IS SCHEDULED FOR 06/24/2016 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT C19.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
123 More Docket Entries
  • 07/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY VARGA, KYLE ON 07/08/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3306351 RECEIVED ON 07/08/2015 09:41:18 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 07/20/2015 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C21 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY VARGA, KYLE ON 01/23/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2015
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3241855 RECEIVED ON 01/23/2015 04:54:50 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER MCEACHEN, DAVID ON 01/22/2015.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11725578 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11549840.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY VARGA, KYLE ON 01/22/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY VARGA, KYLE ON 01/22/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2015
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 4314020 RECEIVED ON 01/22/2015 04:24:17 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less