**********************-CJC
01/22/2015
Not Classified By Court
Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Orange, California
KYLE VARGA
DREYER BABICH BUCCOLA WOOD CAMPORA, LLP
ADRIAN VALENZUELA
DREYER BABICH BUCCOLA WOOD CAMPORA, LLP
LAW OFFICE OF STEVEN D. LEVINE
REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY VARGA, KYLE ON 06/24/2016
E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4565784 REJECTED.
MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL 06/24/2016 09:00:00 AM.
PROPOSED ORDER (NOT SIGNED) FILED BY VALENZUELA, ADRIAN ON 06/13/2016
MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 06/06/2016 09:00:00 AM.
MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 06/03/2016 08:30:00 AM.
DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION FILED BY VARGA, KYLE ON 06/02/2016
OPPOSITION FILED BY VARGA, KYLE ON 06/02/2016
PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING, 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 120.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11977032 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11801161.
JURY INSTRUCTIONS FILED BY VARGA, KYLE ON 06/02/2016
VERDICT (SPECIAL) RECEIVED ON 06/02/2016.
EXHIBIT LIST FILED BY VARGA, KYLE ON 06/02/2016
STATEMENT OF CONTROVERTED ISSUES FILED BY VARGA, KYLE ON 06/02/2016
JURY INSTRUCTIONS FILED BY VARGA, KYLE ON 06/02/2016
WITNESS LIST FILED BY VARGA, KYLE ON 06/02/2016
STATEMENT OF CASE FILED BY VARGA, KYLE ON 06/02/2016
DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY VARGA, KYLE ON 06/02/2016
MOTION IN LIMINE (14) FILED BY VARGA, KYLE ON 06/02/2016
DocketCASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL
[-] Read LessDocketCOMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.
[-] Read LessDocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY VARGA, KYLE ON 06/24/2016
[-] Read LessDocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3428290 RECEIVED ON 06/24/2016 09:50:36 AM.
[-] Read LessDocketE-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4565784 REJECTED.
[-] Read LessDocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL 06/24/2016 09:00:00 AM.
[-] Read LessDocketPROPOSED ORDER (NOT SIGNED) FILED BY VALENZUELA, ADRIAN ON 06/13/2016
[-] Read LessDocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2467405 RECEIVED ON 06/02/2016 10:26:34 AM.
[-] Read LessDocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 06/06/2016 09:00:00 AM.
[-] Read LessDocketTHE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL IS SCHEDULED FOR 06/24/2016 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT C19.
[-] Read LessDocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY VARGA, KYLE ON 07/08/2015
[-] Read LessDocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3306351 RECEIVED ON 07/08/2015 09:41:18 AM.
[-] Read LessDocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 07/20/2015 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C21 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
[-] Read LessDocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY VARGA, KYLE ON 01/23/2015
[-] Read LessDocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3241855 RECEIVED ON 01/23/2015 04:54:50 PM.
[-] Read LessDocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER MCEACHEN, DAVID ON 01/22/2015.
[-] Read LessDocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11725578 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11549840.
[-] Read LessDocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY VARGA, KYLE ON 01/22/2015
[-] Read LessDocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY VARGA, KYLE ON 01/22/2015
[-] Read LessDocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 4314020 RECEIVED ON 01/22/2015 04:24:17 PM.
[-] Read Less