Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/17/2021 at 10:21:23 (UTC).

KYLE ROWELL VS WENDY BERNAL

Case Summary

On 02/02/2021 KYLE ROWELL filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against WENDY BERNAL. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0612

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lamoreaux Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ROWELL, KYLE EDWARD

Respondent

BERNAL, WENDY MICHELLE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketCLERK APPLICATION & ORDER - VOID PETITION 03/08/2021; Filing Party: ROWELL, KYLE EDWARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketNOTICE - VOIDED PETITION 03/08/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketDISMISSAL - OTHER 03/08/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 02/23/2021 PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS; Filing Party: ROWELL, KYLE EDWARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketNOTICE - FEES DUE - FAMILY LAW 02/05/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketORDER - FEE WAIVER DENIED 02/04/2021; Filing Party: ROWELL, KYLE EDWARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketINCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 02/02/2021; Filing Party: ROWELL, KYLE EDWARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketREQUEST - WAIVE COURT FEES 02/02/2021 5C SENT TO DUTY - L611; Filing Party: ROWELL, KYLE EDWARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketPROPERTY DECLARATION - COMMUNITY 02/02/2021; Filing Party: ROWELL, KYLE EDWARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketPROPERTY DECLARATION - SEPARATE 02/02/2021; Filing Party: ROWELL, KYLE EDWARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketNOTICE - RELATED CASE - NO PARTY UPDATE 02/02/2021; Filing Party: ROWELL, KYLE EDWARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS 02/02/2021; Filing Party: ROWELL, KYLE EDWARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketPETITION - DISSOLUTION 02/02/2021 VOIDED 03/08/21 for non-payment of fees; Filing Party: ROWELL, KYLE EDWARD

    Read MoreRead Less