This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 03/31/2017 at 00:14:54 (UTC).

KWICKCASH, INC. VS. MARY LYNN ERPINAR

Case Summary

On 08/12/2013 KWICKCASH, INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MARY LYNN ERPINAR. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-HNB

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KWICKCASH, INC.

Defendant

MARY LYNN ERPINAR

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2013
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF JUDGMENT UNCONTESTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2013
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF JUDGMENT UNCONTESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2013
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY (SMALL CLAIMS) FILED BY KWICKCASH, INC. ON 12/17/2013; Filing Party: KWICKCASH, INC. ON 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2013
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL 12/17/2013 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2013
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 12/17/2013 AT 08:30:00 AM IN H13 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2013
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL REASSIGNED TO H13 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH ON 12/17/2013 AT 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2013
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT - PERSONAL FILED BY KWICKCASH, INC. ON 08/20/2013; Filing Party: KWICKCASH, INC. ON 08/20/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 06 - SMALL CLAIMS GREATER THAN 12 WITHIN PREVIOUS 12 MONTHS IN THE AMOUNT OF 100.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11429991 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11253863.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 10/10/2013 AT 08:30:00 AM IN H10 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT FILED BY KWICKCASH, INC. ON 08/12/2013; Filing Party: KWICKCASH, INC. ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less