This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 11/12/2019 at 06:48:15 (UTC).

KRISTY ERICSON VS. YOUNG MENS CHRISTIAN ASSOCIATION

Case Summary

On 08/30/2019 KRISTY ERICSON filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against YOUNG MENS CHRISTIAN ASSOCIATION. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kristy Ericson

Defendants

Anaheim Family YMCA

Young Men's Christian Association of Anaheim

Cristina Casas

Young Mens Christian Association

Young Men's Christian Association of Ahaheim

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Yun & Simonian, PC

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY ERICSON, KRISTY ON 08/30/2019

COMPLAINT FILED BY ERICSON, KRISTY ON 08/30/2019

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ERICSON, KRISTY ON 08/30/2019

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ERICSON, KRISTY ON 08/30/2019

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ERICSON, KRISTY ON 08/30/2019

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ERICSON, KRISTY ON 08/30/2019

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12615477 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12439976.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12615477 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12439976.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER LEE, RICHARD ON 08/30/2019.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER LEE, RICHARD ON 08/30/2019.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY ERICSON, KRISTY ON 09/19/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY ERICSON, KRISTY ON 09/19/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY ERICSON, KRISTY ON 09/19/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY ERICSON, KRISTY ON 09/19/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY ERICSON, KRISTY ON 09/19/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY ERICSON, KRISTY ON 09/19/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY ERICSON, KRISTY ON 09/19/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY ERICSON, KRISTY ON 09/19/2019

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2850053 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2850053 REJECTED.

AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY ERICSON, KRISTY ON 10/18/2019

AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY ERICSON, KRISTY ON 10/18/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY ERICSON, KRISTY ON 10/18/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41025204 RECEIVED ON 10/18/2019 05:21:19 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2850053 REJECTED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY ERICSON, KRISTY ON 09/19/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY ERICSON, KRISTY ON 09/19/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY ERICSON, KRISTY ON 09/19/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY ERICSON, KRISTY ON 09/19/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1667852 RECEIVED ON 09/19/2019 11:20:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER LEE, RICHARD ON 08/30/2019.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12615477 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12439976.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ERICSON, KRISTY ON 08/30/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ERICSON, KRISTY ON 08/30/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY ERICSON, KRISTY ON 08/30/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1661288 RECEIVED ON 08/30/2019 01:55:34 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less