This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 02/14/2022 at 04:42:02 (UTC).

KRISTINA COCOLI VS. WORLD OF JEANS & TOPS

Case Summary

On 03/08/2021 KRISTINA COCOLI filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against WORLD OF JEANS TOPS. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KRISTINA COCOLI

Defendant

WORLD OF JEANS & TOPS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Excelsior Law

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY COCOLI, KRISTINA ON 03/08/2021

COMPLAINT FILED BY COCOLI, KRISTINA ON 03/08/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY COCOLI, KRISTINA ON 03/08/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY COCOLI, KRISTINA ON 03/08/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY COCOLI, KRISTINA ON 03/08/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY COCOLI, KRISTINA ON 03/08/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12854731 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12682413.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12854731 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12682413.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/21/2021 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C20 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/21/2021 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C20 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CASE REASSIGNED TO LON HURWITZ EFFECTIVE 07/16/2021.

CASE REASSIGNED TO LON HURWITZ EFFECTIVE 07/16/2021.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY COCOLI, KRISTINA ON 09/13/2021

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY COCOLI, KRISTINA ON 09/13/2021

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketCASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY COCOLI, KRISTINA ON 09/13/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41239635 RECEIVED ON 09/13/2021 02:38:04 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE REASSIGNED TO C20 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER ON 09/21/2021 AT 09:00:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE REASSIGNED TO LON HURWITZ EFFECTIVE 07/16/2021.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/21/2021 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C20 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12854731 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12682413.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1819764 RECEIVED ON 03/08/2021 11:58:08 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER MARGINES, CHARLES ON 03/08/2021.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY COCOLI, KRISTINA ON 03/08/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY COCOLI, KRISTINA ON 03/08/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY COCOLI, KRISTINA ON 03/08/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WORLD OF JEANS TOPS INC is a litigant