This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 03/07/2019 at 08:20:28 (UTC).

KRISTEN PETERS VS MATTHEW PETERS

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 KRISTEN PETERS filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MATTHEW PETERS. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1713

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lamoreaux Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

PETERS, KRISTEN

Respondent

PETERS, MATTHEW

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

COWHIG, JOHN S.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2017
  • WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY 04/21/2017; Filing Party: PETERS, MATTHEW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2016
  • WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY 10/18/2016; Filing Party: PETERS, KRISTEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2016
  • NOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 09/12/2016; Filing Party: PETERS, MATTHEW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2016
  • JUDGMENT - DISSOLUTION 09/12/2016; Filing Party: PETERS, MATTHEW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2016
  • JUDGMENT - FAMILY CODE 2336 09/12/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2016
  • DECLARATION - DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT 09/09/2016; Filing Party: PETERS, MATTHEW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2016
  • RETURN SHEET - EXPEDITED JUDGMENT 09/02/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2016
  • RETURN SHEET - EXPEDITED JUDGMENT 07/27/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2016
  • WAIVER - FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 07/25/2016; Filing Party: PETERS, MATTHEW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2016
  • STIPULATION & WAIVERS (NO FEE) 07/25/2016; Filing Party: PETERS, MATTHEW

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 04/07/2016
  • DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 04/07/2016; Filing Party: PETERS, KRISTEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - MAIL 04/06/2016; Filing Party: PETERS, MATTHEW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2016
  • DECLARATION - UNIFORM CUSTODY 04/06/2016; Filing Party: PETERS, MATTHEW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2016
  • RESPONSE - DISSOLUTION 04/06/2016 Amount:$435.00; Filing Party: PETERS, MATTHEW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • NOTICE & ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT 03/11/2016; Filing Party: PETERS, KRISTEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 03/11/2016; Filing Party: PETERS, KRISTEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 02/26/2016; Filing Party: PETERS, KRISTEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • SUMMONS 02/26/2016; Filing Party: PETERS, KRISTEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • DECLARATION - UNIFORM CUSTODY 02/26/2016; Filing Party: PETERS, KRISTEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • PETITION - DISSOLUTION 02/26/2016 Amount:$435.00; Filing Party: PETERS, KRISTEN

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.