This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/12/2019 at 09:19:10 (UTC).

KOREA RESOLUTION & COLLECTION CORPORATION VS. YOUNG WOO HUR

Case Summary

On 07/26/2018 KOREA RESOLUTION COLLECTION CORPORATION filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against YOUNG WOO HUR. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KOREA RESOLUTION & COLLECTION CORPORATION

KOREA RESOLUTION & COLLECTION CORPORAT

Defendants

YOUNG WOO HUR

CLARA YUNHEE HUR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KAHANA & FELD LLP

Defendant Attorney

LIMNEXUS LLP

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY KOREA RESOLUTION & COLLECTION CORPORATION ON 06/11/2019

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY KOREA RESOLUTION & COLLECTION CORPORATION ON 06/11/2019

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ADR REVIEW HEARING 06/05/2019 08:45:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ADR REVIEW HEARING 06/05/2019 08:45:00 AM.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1630616 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1630616 REJECTED.

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY KOREA RESOLUTION & COLLECTION CORPORATION ON 05/22/2019

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY KOREA RESOLUTION & COLLECTION CORPORATION ON 05/22/2019

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 10/30/2018 08:45:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 10/30/2018 08:45:00 AM.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY KOREA RESOLUTION & COLLECTION CORPORATION ON 10/22/2018

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY KOREA RESOLUTION & COLLECTION CORPORATION ON 10/22/2018

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12436626 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12260305.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12436626 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12260305.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY HUR, CLARA YUNHEE; HUR, YOUNG WOO ON 10/15/2018

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY HUR, CLARA YUNHEE; HUR, YOUNG WOO ON 10/15/2018

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY HUR, CLARA YUNHEE; HUR, YOUNG WOO ON 10/15/2018

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY HUR, CLARA YUNHEE; HUR, YOUNG WOO ON 10/15/2018

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 870.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12421896 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12245594.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 870.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12421896 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12245594.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY HUR, CLARA YUNHEE ON 09/14/2018

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY HUR, CLARA YUNHEE ON 09/14/2018

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY HUR, YOUNG WOO ON 09/14/2018

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY HUR, YOUNG WOO ON 09/14/2018

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 10/30/2018 AT 08:45:00 AM IN C25 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 10/30/2018 AT 08:45:00 AM IN C25 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

DECLARATION OF DUE DILIGENCE FILED BY KOREA RESOLUTION & COLLECTION CORPORATION ON 08/08/2018

DECLARATION OF DUE DILIGENCE FILED BY KOREA RESOLUTION & COLLECTION CORPORATION ON 08/08/2018

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTE SERVICE FILED BY KOREA RESOLUTION & COLLECTION CORPORATION ON 08/08/2018

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTE SERVICE FILED BY KOREA RESOLUTION & COLLECTION CORPORATION ON 08/08/2018

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY KOREA RESOLUTION & COLLECTION CORPORATION ON 08/08/2018

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY KOREA RESOLUTION & COLLECTION CORPORATION ON 08/08/2018

NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION FILED BY KOREA RESOLUTION & COLLECTION CORPORATION ON 08/02/2018

NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION FILED BY KOREA RESOLUTION & COLLECTION CORPORATION ON 08/02/2018

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER FELL, SHEILA ON 07/26/2018.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER FELL, SHEILA ON 07/26/2018.

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY KOREA RESOLUTION & COLLECTION CORPORATION ON 06/11/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 4979138 RECEIVED ON 06/11/2019 04:03:16 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • DocketCASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • DocketCOMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR ADR REVIEW HEARING 06/05/2019 08:45:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • DocketTHE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE IS SCHEDULED FOR 07/31/2019 AT 08:45 AM IN DEPARTMENT C25.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE SCHEDULED FOR 07/31/2019 AT 08:45:00 AM IN C25 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1630616 REJECTED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY KOREA RESOLUTION & COLLECTION CORPORATION ON 05/22/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2797498 RECEIVED ON 05/22/2019 01:40:21 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 08/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY KOREA RESOLUTION & COLLECTION CORPORATION ON 08/08/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2699719 RECEIVED ON 08/08/2018 12:01:13 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION FILED BY KOREA RESOLUTION & COLLECTION CORPORATION ON 08/02/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3694797 RECEIVED ON 08/02/2018 04:00:16 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER FELL, SHEILA ON 07/26/2018.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12391109 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12214799.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY KOREA RESOLUTION & COLLECTION CORPORATION ON 07/26/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY KOREA RESOLUTION & COLLECTION CORPORATION ON 07/26/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY KOREA RESOLUTION & COLLECTION CORPORATION ON 07/26/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1523613 RECEIVED ON 07/26/2018 10:34:32 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KOREA RESOLUTION & COLLECTION CORPORATION is a litigant