This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/10/2019 at 06:09:02 (UTC).

KOREA RESOLUTION & COLLECTION CORPORATION VS. JONG WON LEE

Case Summary

On 11/13/2017 KOREA RESOLUTION COLLECTION CORPORATION filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against JONG WON LEE. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KOREA RESOLUTION & COLLECTION CORPORATION

KOREA RESOLUTION & COLLECTION CORPORAT

Defendants

JONG WON LEE

CHO Y. LEE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KAHANA & FELD LLP

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION (WITHDRAWAL) FILED BY KOREA RESOLUTION & COLLECTION CORPORATION ON 10/22/2018

NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION (WITHDRAWAL) FILED BY KOREA RESOLUTION & COLLECTION CORPORATION ON 10/22/2018

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1551914 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1551914 REJECTED.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE 08/14/2018 08:45:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE 08/14/2018 08:45:00 AM.

NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY KOREA RESOLUTION & COLLECTION CORPORATION ON 06/14/2018

NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY KOREA RESOLUTION & COLLECTION CORPORATION ON 06/14/2018

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 06/11/2018 02:00:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 06/11/2018 02:00:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 04/02/2018 02:00:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 04/02/2018 02:00:00 PM.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY KOREA RESOLUTION & COLLECTION CORPORATION ON 03/19/2018

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY KOREA RESOLUTION & COLLECTION CORPORATION ON 03/19/2018

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY KOREA RESOLUTION & COLLECTION CORPORATION ON 01/24/2018

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY KOREA RESOLUTION & COLLECTION CORPORATION ON 01/24/2018

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY KOREA RESOLUTION & COLLECTION CORPORATION ON 01/24/2018

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY KOREA RESOLUTION & COLLECTION CORPORATION ON 01/24/2018

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 04/02/2018 AT 02:00:00 PM IN C10 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 04/02/2018 AT 02:00:00 PM IN C10 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO COMPLY RE:CRC 3.110B SCHEDULED FOR 02/13/2018 AT 08:45:00 AM IN C10 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO COMPLY RE:CRC 3.110B SCHEDULED FOR 02/13/2018 AT 08:45:00 AM IN C10 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION FILED BY KOREA RESOLUTION & COLLECTION CORPORATION ON 11/16/2017

NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION FILED BY KOREA RESOLUTION & COLLECTION CORPORATION ON 11/16/2017

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER MARKS, LINDA ON 11/13/2017.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER MARKS, LINDA ON 11/13/2017.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12252148 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12075868.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12252148 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12075868.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY KOREA RESOLUTION & COLLECTION CORPORATION ON 11/13/2017

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY KOREA RESOLUTION & COLLECTION CORPORATION ON 11/13/2017

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY KOREA RESOLUTION & COLLECTION CORPORATION ON 11/13/2017

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY KOREA RESOLUTION & COLLECTION CORPORATION ON 11/13/2017

COMPLAINT FILED BY KOREA RESOLUTION & COLLECTION CORPORATION ON 11/13/2017

COMPLAINT FILED BY KOREA RESOLUTION & COLLECTION CORPORATION ON 11/13/2017

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION (WITHDRAWAL) FILED BY KOREA RESOLUTION & COLLECTION CORPORATION ON 10/22/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3722042 RECEIVED ON 10/22/2018 02:20:35 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1551914 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE 08/14/2018 08:45:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • COURT ORDERS THE ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT-ORDERED DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT-ORDERED DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY KOREA RESOLUTION & COLLECTION CORPORATION ON 06/14/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3677790 RECEIVED ON 06/14/2018 09:09:06 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 12/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 04/02/2018 AT 02:00:00 PM IN C10 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO COMPLY RE:CRC 3.110B SCHEDULED FOR 02/13/2018 AT 08:45:00 AM IN C10 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION FILED BY KOREA RESOLUTION & COLLECTION CORPORATION ON 11/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1441378 RECEIVED ON 11/16/2017 10:51:15 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER MARKS, LINDA ON 11/13/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12252148 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12075868.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY KOREA RESOLUTION & COLLECTION CORPORATION ON 11/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY KOREA RESOLUTION & COLLECTION CORPORATION ON 11/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY KOREA RESOLUTION & COLLECTION CORPORATION ON 11/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2611876 RECEIVED ON 11/13/2017 02:27:53 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KOREA RESOLUTION & COLLECTION CORPORATION is a litigant