This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 11/16/2019 at 06:58:49 (UTC).

KNOWLES SECURITY, INC. VS. AMFP IV ATRIUM, LLC

Case Summary

On 09/03/2019 KNOWLES SECURITY, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against AMFP IV ATRIUM, LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    09/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Knowles Security, Inc.

Defendants

AMFP IV Atrium, LLC

Atrium At West Covina

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Law Office of Mark H. Cheung

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY KNOWLES SECURITY, INC. ON 11/13/2019

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY KNOWLES SECURITY, INC. ON 11/13/2019

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3851170 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3851170 REJECTED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY KNOWLES SECURITY, INC. ON 10/01/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY KNOWLES SECURITY, INC. ON 10/01/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY KNOWLES SECURITY, INC. ON 09/17/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY KNOWLES SECURITY, INC. ON 09/17/2019

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12616739 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12441238.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12616739 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12441238.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY KNOWLES SECURITY, INC. ON 09/03/2019

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY KNOWLES SECURITY, INC. ON 09/03/2019

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY KNOWLES SECURITY, INC. ON 09/03/2019

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY KNOWLES SECURITY, INC. ON 09/03/2019

COMPLAINT FILED BY KNOWLES SECURITY, INC. ON 09/03/2019

COMPLAINT FILED BY KNOWLES SECURITY, INC. ON 09/03/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY KNOWLES SECURITY, INC. ON 11/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3856045 RECEIVED ON 11/13/2019 12:18:26 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3851170 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY KNOWLES SECURITY, INC. ON 10/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3840325 RECEIVED ON 10/01/2019 09:39:24 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY KNOWLES SECURITY, INC. ON 09/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2838682 RECEIVED ON 09/17/2019 04:48:43 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12616739 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12441238.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY KNOWLES SECURITY, INC. ON 09/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY KNOWLES SECURITY, INC. ON 09/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY KNOWLES SECURITY, INC. ON 09/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1661855 RECEIVED ON 09/03/2019 01:48:06 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMFP IV ATRIUM LLC. is a litigant