This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 05/23/2017 at 05:16:21 (UTC).

KNOTT VICTORIA APARTMENTS, LLC VS. SHANTEE RUSS

Case Summary

On 08/12/2013 KNOTT VICTORIA APARTMENTS, LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against SHANTEE RUSS. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, North Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-NJC

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KNOTT VICTORIA APARTMENTS, LLC

Defendant

SHANTEE RUSS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CALDER AND MELLO, APC

 

Court Documents

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY KNOTT VICTORIA APARTMENTS, LLC ON 10/10/2013

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY KNOTT VICTORIA APARTMENTS, LLC ON 10/10/2013

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY KNOTT VICTORIA APARTMENTS, LLC ON 08/21/2013

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY KNOTT VICTORIA APARTMENTS, LLC ON 08/21/2013

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (COURT JUDGMENT) FILED BY KNOTT VICTORIA APARTMENTS, LLC ON 10/10/2013

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (COURT JUDGMENT) FILED BY KNOTT VICTORIA APARTMENTS, LLC ON 10/10/2013

COMPLAINT FILED BY KNOTT VICTORIA APARTMENTS, LLC ON 08/12/2013

COMPLAINT FILED BY KNOTT VICTORIA APARTMENTS, LLC ON 08/12/2013

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY KNOTT VICTORIA APARTMENTS, LLC ON 08/12/2013

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY KNOTT VICTORIA APARTMENTS, LLC ON 08/12/2013

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11435908 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11259780.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11435908 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11259780.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY KNOTT VICTORIA APARTMENTS, LLC ON 08/20/2013

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY KNOTT VICTORIA APARTMENTS, LLC ON 08/20/2013

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER SUBMITTED BY KNOTT VICTORIA APARTMENTS, LLC REJECTED ON 10/16/2013.

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER SUBMITTED BY KNOTT VICTORIA APARTMENTS, LLC REJECTED ON 10/16/2013.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY KNOTT VICTORIA APARTMENTS, LLC ON 08/20/2013

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY KNOTT VICTORIA APARTMENTS, LLC ON 08/20/2013

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY KNOTT VICTORIA APARTMENTS, LLC ON 08/21/2013

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY KNOTT VICTORIA APARTMENTS, LLC ON 08/21/2013

PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 10/10/2013.

PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 10/10/2013.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER

WRIT (ISSUED ON 08/21/13) RECEIVED ON 08/20/2013.

WRIT (ISSUED ON 08/21/13) RECEIVED ON 08/20/2013.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY KNOTT VICTORIA APARTMENTS, LLC ON 10/10/2013

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY KNOTT VICTORIA APARTMENTS, LLC ON 10/10/2013

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION RECEIVED ON 08/20/2013.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION RECEIVED ON 08/20/2013.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY KNOTT VICTORIA APARTMENTS, LLC ON 08/12/2013

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY KNOTT VICTORIA APARTMENTS, LLC ON 08/12/2013

PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 08/20/2013.

PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 08/20/2013.

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER SUBMITTED BY KNOTT VICTORIA APARTMENTS, LLC REJECTED ON 10/16/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY KNOTT VICTORIA APARTMENTS, LLC ON 10/10/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 10/10/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (COURT JUDGMENT) FILED BY KNOTT VICTORIA APARTMENTS, LLC ON 10/10/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY KNOTT VICTORIA APARTMENTS, LLC ON 10/10/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 489951 RECEIVED ON 10/10/2013 01:11:31 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY KNOTT VICTORIA APARTMENTS, LLC ON 09/27/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY KNOTT VICTORIA APARTMENTS, LLC ON 08/21/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY KNOTT VICTORIA APARTMENTS, LLC ON 08/21/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2013
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 08/20/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 08/20/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY KNOTT VICTORIA APARTMENTS, LLC ON 08/20/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY KNOTT VICTORIA APARTMENTS, LLC ON 08/20/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2272799 RECEIVED ON 08/20/2013 01:02:12 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY KNOTT VICTORIA APARTMENTS, LLC ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY KNOTT VICTORIA APARTMENTS, LLC ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY KNOTT VICTORIA APARTMENTS, LLC ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 462388 RECEIVED ON 08/12/2013 12:20:43 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less