This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 05/10/2022 at 20:02:05 (UTC).

KINZIE JOLENE GIDEON VS. CERCA TROVA STEAKHOUSE, INC.

Case Summary

On 02/25/2022 KINZIE JOLENE GIDEON filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CERCA TROVA STEAKHOUSE, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KINZIE JOLENE GIDEON

Defendants

OUTBACK STEAKHOUSE OF FLORID

OUTBACK STEAKHOUSE

CERCA TROVA STEAKHOUSE, INC.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketCASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF OTHER COURT DISMISSAL - CONDITIONAL OR GOOD FAITH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketCOURT ORDERS THE ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketAMENDED CLAIM - PLAINTIFF DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF OTHER COURT DISMISSAL - CONDITIONAL OR GOOD FAITH .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL 05/04/2022 01:30:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketMEDIATION WAS SUCCESSFUL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketSTIPULATION/ORDER - OTHER (CCP 664.6) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 05/04/2022; Filing Party: THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 05/04/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT - CERTIFIED MAIL BY CLERK FILED BY GIDEON, KINZIE JOLENE ON 04/01/2022; Filing Party: GIDEON, KINZIE JOLENE ON 04/01/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketCERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 03/23/2022; Filing Party: THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 03/23/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketCERTIFIED MAIL STATEMENT FILED BY GIDEON, KINZIE JOLENE ON 03/22/2022; Filing Party: GIDEON, KINZIE JOLENE ON 03/22/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketAMENDED CLAIM - PLAINTIFF FILED BY GIDEON, KINZIE JOLENE ON 03/22/2022; Filing Party: GIDEON, KINZIE JOLENE ON 03/22/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 05/04/2022 AT 01:30:00 PM IN VCC5 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketREQUEST FOR RESET OF SMALL CLAIMS HEARING FILED BY GIDEON, KINZIE JOLENE ON 03/22/2022; Filing Party: GIDEON, KINZIE JOLENE ON 03/22/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketGIDEON, KINZIE JOLENE REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES GRANTED IN WHOLE ON 02/25/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 02/25/2022; Filing Party: THE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketREQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY GIDEON, KINZIE JOLENE ON 02/25/2022; Filing Party: GIDEON, KINZIE JOLENE ON 02/25/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 04/11/2022 AT 01:30:00 PM IN VCC5 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT FILED BY GIDEON, KINZIE JOLENE ON 02/25/2022; Filing Party: GIDEON, KINZIE JOLENE ON 02/25/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CERCA TROVA STEAKHOUSE INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where OUTBACK STEAKHOUSE OF FLORIDA LLC is a litigant