This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 09/13/2020 at 10:18:04 (UTC).

KIMBERLY TORRES VS RENE MONTES DE OCA

Case Summary

On 07/01/2020 KIMBERLY TORRES filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against RENE MONTES DE OCA. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WATSON, WILLIAM. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1165

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lamoreaux Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

Judge Details

Judge

WATSON, WILLIAM

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

TORRES, KIMBERLY

MONTES DE OCA, RENE AVILA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/24/2020
  • HearingDescription: HEARING - DOMESTIC VIOLENCE; Department: L63

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketHEARING - DOMESTIC VIOLENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • HearingDescription: HEARING - DOMESTIC VIOLENCE; Department: L63

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketNOTICE - SHERIFF 09/02/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketDV ORDER - REQUEST TO CONTINUE 09/02/2020; Filing Party: TORRES, KIMBERLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketDV PROOF - PERSONAL SERVICE 09/02/2020; Filing Party: TORRES, KIMBERLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketACCEPT - WATSON - STIP TO COMMISSIONER - ALL PURPOSES 09/02/2020; Filing Party: TORRES, KIMBERLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER 09/02/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketHEARING - DOMESTIC VIOLENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE 08/25/2020; Filing Party: TORRES, KIMBERLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • HearingDescription: HEARING - EX PARTE - DOMESTIC VIOLENCE; Department: L63

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketNOTICE - RELATED CASE - NO PARTY UPDATE 07/01/2020; Filing Party: TORRES, KIMBERLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketDV REQUEST - RESTRAINING ORDER 07/01/2020; Filing Party: TORRES, KIMBERLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketDV TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER 07/01/2020; Filing Party: TORRES, KIMBERLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketDV NOTICE - COURT HEARING DOMESTIC VIOLENCE 07/01/2020; Filing Party: TORRES, KIMBERLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketORDER - MEET WITH COURT INVESTIGATOR 07/01/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketHEARING - EX PARTE - DOMESTIC VIOLENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketEX PARTE REQUEST - DOMESTIC VIOLENCE 07/01/2020; Filing Party: TORRES, KIMBERLY

    Read MoreRead Less