This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/11/2019 at 08:40:26 (UTC).

KIMBERLY PENCE VS. SOBER LIVING BY THE SEA, INC.

Case Summary

On 04/25/2018 KIMBERLY PENCE filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against SOBER LIVING BY THE SEA, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Civil Complex Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CXC

  • Filing Date:

    04/25/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KIMBERLY PENCE

Defendant

SOBER LIVING BY THE SEA, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BIBIYAN LAW GROUP, P.C.

Defendant Attorneys

PAUL, PLEVIN, SULLIVAN & CONNAUGHTON LLP

WALLER LANSDEN DORTCH & DAVIS, LLP

Other Attorneys

PAUL, PLEVIN, SULLIVAN & CONNAUGHTON L

 

Court Documents

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 05/03/2019 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 05/03/2019 09:00:00 AM.

NOTICE - OTHER (APPEARANCE) FILED BY SOBER LIVING BY THE SEA, INC. ON 01/16/2019

NOTICE - OTHER (APPEARANCE) FILED BY SOBER LIVING BY THE SEA, INC. ON 01/16/2019

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3748503 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3748503 REJECTED.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 01/08/2019 03:39:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 01/08/2019 03:39:00 PM.

NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY FILED BY PENCE, KIMBERLY ON 01/07/2019

NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY FILED BY PENCE, KIMBERLY ON 01/07/2019

STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY PENCE, KIMBERLY ON 01/03/2019

STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY PENCE, KIMBERLY ON 01/03/2019

ORDER - OTHER (PRO HAC VICE - ANDREW S. NAYLOR) FILED BY SOBER LIVING BY THE SEA, INC. ON 08/31/2018

ORDER - OTHER (PRO HAC VICE - ANDREW S. NAYLOR) FILED BY SOBER LIVING BY THE SEA, INC. ON 08/31/2018

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12412188 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12235913.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12412188 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12235913.

ORDER GRANTING (PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION ON HEATH H. EDWARDS) FILED BY SOBER LIVING BY THE SEA, INC. ON 07/02/2018

ORDER GRANTING (PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION ON HEATH H. EDWARDS) FILED BY SOBER LIVING BY THE SEA, INC. ON 07/02/2018

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 09/04/2018 01:55:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 09/04/2018 01:55:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 08/31/2018 10:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 08/31/2018 10:00:00 AM.

NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY FILED BY PENCE, KIMBERLY ON 08/29/2018

NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY FILED BY PENCE, KIMBERLY ON 08/29/2018

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12409395 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12233103.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12409395 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12233103.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY PENCE, KIMBERLY ON 08/29/2018

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY PENCE, KIMBERLY ON 08/29/2018

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED BY SOBER LIVING BY THE SEA, INC. ON 08/28/2018

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED BY SOBER LIVING BY THE SEA, INC. ON 08/28/2018

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PENCE, KIMBERLY ON 08/24/2018

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PENCE, KIMBERLY ON 08/24/2018

NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY FILED BY SOBER LIVING BY THE SEA, INC. ON 07/26/2018

NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY FILED BY SOBER LIVING BY THE SEA, INC. ON 07/26/2018

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 05/03/2019 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • STATUS CONFERENCE CONTINUED TO 08/29/2019 AT 01:30 PM IN THIS DEPARTMENT PURSUANT TO PARTY'S MOTION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • STATUS CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 08/29/2019 AT 01:30:00 PM IN CX105 AT CIVIL COMPLEX CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE - OTHER (APPEARANCE) FILED BY SOBER LIVING BY THE SEA, INC. ON 01/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4927203 RECEIVED ON 01/16/2019 12:19:50 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3748503 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 01/08/2019 03:39:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • STATUS CONFERENCE CONTINUED TO 05/03/2019 AT 09:00 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT PURSUANT TO COURT'S MOTION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • STATUS CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 05/03/2019 AT 09:00:00 AM IN CX105 AT CIVIL COMPLEX CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
47 More Docket Entries
  • 05/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 05/16/2018 04:10:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR 08/31/2018 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT CX105.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 08/31/2018 AT 09:00:00 AM IN CX105 AT CIVIL COMPLEX CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SHERMAN, RANDALL ON 04/25/2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 34 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - PLAINTIFF IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12338812 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12162553.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PENCE, KIMBERLY ON 04/25/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PENCE, KIMBERLY ON 04/25/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY PENCE, KIMBERLY ON 04/25/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1492482 RECEIVED ON 04/25/2018 09:13:01 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOBER LIVING BY THE SEA INC. is a litigant