This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 11:49:20 (UTC).

KIMBERLY LOUISE MARTIN VS. CITY OF HUNTINGTON BEACH

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 KIMBERLY LOUISE MARTIN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CITY OF HUNTINGTON BEACH. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KIMBERLY LOUISE MARTIN

RONALD DALE MARTIN JR

Defendants and Cross Defendants

COUNTY OF ORANGE

STATE OF CALIFORNIA

CITY OF HUNTINGTON BEACH

PURE EFFECT, INC.

AVALONBAY COMMUNITIES, INC.

Defendant and Other

AVALONBAY COMMUNITIES, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CHAMBERS, NORONHA & KUBOTA

LAW OFFICES OF CHAMBERS & NORONHA

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

YUKEVICH | CAVANAUGH

YUKEVICH CAVANAUGH

ANDREWS LAGASSE BRANCH & BELL LLP

Defendant and Other Attorney

ANDREWS LAGASSE BRANCH & BELL LLP

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FIRSTLEGALNETWORK FOR 38 - MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR ADJUDICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 500.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12129921 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11953741.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FIRSTLEGALNETWORK FOR 38 - MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR ADJUDICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 500.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12129921 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11953741.

EXHIBIT LIST FILED BY MARTIN, KIMBERLY LOUISE; MARTIN, RONALD DALE JR ON 05/25/2017

EXHIBIT LIST FILED BY MARTIN, KIMBERLY LOUISE; MARTIN, RONALD DALE JR ON 05/25/2017

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/13/2016 AT 02:00:00 PM IN C10 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/13/2016 AT 02:00:00 PM IN C10 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE (OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) FILED BY MARTIN, KIMBERLY LOUISE; MARTIN, RONALD DALE JR ON 10/12/2016

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE (OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) FILED BY MARTIN, KIMBERLY LOUISE; MARTIN, RONALD DALE JR ON 10/12/2016

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY AVALONBAY COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 08/12/2016

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY AVALONBAY COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 08/12/2016

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 03/24/2017

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 03/24/2017

MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND FILED BY MARTIN, KIMBERLY LOUISE; MARTIN, RONALD DALE ON 05/25/2017

MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND FILED BY MARTIN, KIMBERLY LOUISE; MARTIN, RONALD DALE ON 05/25/2017

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PURE EFFECT, INC. ON 10/27/2016

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PURE EFFECT, INC. ON 10/27/2016

OPPOSITION FILED BY MARTIN, KIMBERLY LOUISE; MARTIN, RONALD DALE JR ON 05/25/2017

OPPOSITION FILED BY MARTIN, KIMBERLY LOUISE; MARTIN, RONALD DALE JR ON 05/25/2017

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 05/08/2017

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 05/08/2017

SEPARATE STATEMENT FILED BY PURE EFFECT, INC. ON 03/24/2017

SEPARATE STATEMENT FILED BY PURE EFFECT, INC. ON 03/24/2017

PROPOSED ORDER (NOT SIGNED) FILED BY MARTIN, KIMBERLY LOUISE; MARTIN, RONALD DALE ON 06/02/2017

PROPOSED ORDER (NOT SIGNED) FILED BY MARTIN, KIMBERLY LOUISE; MARTIN, RONALD DALE ON 06/02/2017

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 05/19/2017

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 05/19/2017

SEPARATE STATEMENT FILED BY MARTIN, KIMBERLY LOUISE; MARTIN, RONALD DALE JR ON 05/25/2017

SEPARATE STATEMENT FILED BY MARTIN, KIMBERLY LOUISE; MARTIN, RONALD DALE JR ON 05/25/2017

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY CITY OF HUNTINGTON BEACH; AVALONBAY COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 08/19/2016

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY CITY OF HUNTINGTON BEACH; AVALONBAY COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 08/19/2016

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY AVALONBAY COMMUNITIES, INC.; CITY OF HUNTINGTON BEACH ON 08/12/2016

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY AVALONBAY COMMUNITIES, INC.; CITY OF HUNTINGTON BEACH ON 08/12/2016

ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY PURE EFFECT, INC. ON 09/30/2016

ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY PURE EFFECT, INC. ON 09/30/2016

EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER (SCHEDULING MOTION) FILED BY AVALONBAY COMMUNITIES, INC.; PURE EFFECT, INC. ON 02/14/2017

EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER (SCHEDULING MOTION) FILED BY AVALONBAY COMMUNITIES, INC.; PURE EFFECT, INC. ON 02/14/2017

89 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2017
  • PROPOSED ORDER (NOT SIGNED) FILED BY CITY OF HUNTINGTON BEACH; AVALONBAY COMMUNITIES, INC.; PURE EFFECT, INC. ON 07/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3526163 RECEIVED ON 03/24/2017 11:53:27 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED ORDER (NOT SIGNED) FILED BY MARTIN, KIMBERLY LOUISE; MARTIN, RONALD DALE ON 07/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4729551 RECEIVED ON 05/25/2017 08:50:03 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • PROPOSED ORDER (NOT SIGNED) FILED BY PURE EFFECT, INC. ON 07/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4698596 RECEIVED ON 03/24/2017 01:43:53 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED ORDER (NOT SIGNED) FILED BY MARTIN, KIMBERLY LOUISE; MARTIN, RONALD DALE ON 07/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1386453 RECEIVED ON 05/23/2017 10:27:55 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
156 More Docket Entries
  • 05/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY MARTIN, KIMBERLY LOUISE ON 05/03/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4541522 RECEIVED ON 05/03/2016 08:35:32 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/13/2016 AT 02:00:00 PM IN C10 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO COMPLY RE:CRC 3.110B SCHEDULED FOR 05/17/2016 AT 08:45:00 AM IN C10 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER MARKS, LINDA ON 02/26/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FIRSTLEGALNETWORK FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11928279 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11752497.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MARTIN, KIMBERLY LOUISE; MARTIN, RONALD DALE JR ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MARTIN, KIMBERLY LOUISE; MARTIN, RONALD DALE JR ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY MARTIN, KIMBERLY LOUISE; MARTIN, RONALD DALE JR ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4509913 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 05:21:36 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.