This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 03/07/2019 at 08:19:50 (UTC).

KIMBER MCNAMARA-JACKSON VS HENRY JACKSON JR

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 KIMBER MCNAMARA-JACKSON filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against HENRY JACKSON JR. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1674

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lamoreaux Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MCNAMARA-JACKSON, KIMBER LEIGH

Respondent

JACKSON JR, HENRY TYREE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2016
  • EX PARTE APPLICATION - RESTORATION FORMER NAME 10/20/2016; Filing Party: MCNAMARA-JACKSON, KIMBER LEIGH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2016
  • NOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 07/29/2016; Filing Party: MCNAMARA-JACKSON, KIMBER LEIGH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2016
  • PROPERTY DECLARATION 07/29/2016; Filing Party: MCNAMARA-JACKSON, KIMBER LEIGH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2016
  • DECLARATION - DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT 07/29/2016; Filing Party: MCNAMARA-JACKSON, KIMBER LEIGH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2016
  • PROPERTY DECLARATION 07/29/2016; Filing Party: MCNAMARA-JACKSON, KIMBER LEIGH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2016
  • JUDGMENT - DISSOLUTION 07/29/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2016
  • STIPULATION - COURT APPOINTED TEMPORARY JUDGE 07/29/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2016
  • MINUTE ORDER 07/29/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2016
  • HEARING - DISSOLUTION - UNCONTESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2016
  • MEMORANDUM - SET HEARING 05/16/2016; Filing Party: MCNAMARA-JACKSON, KIMBER LEIGH

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 05/04/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 05/04/2016; Filing Party: MCNAMARA-JACKSON, KIMBER LEIGH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2016
  • PROPERTY DECLARATION - COMMUNITY 05/04/2016; Filing Party: MCNAMARA-JACKSON, KIMBER LEIGH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2016
  • PROPERTY DECLARATION - SEPARATE 05/04/2016; Filing Party: MCNAMARA-JACKSON, KIMBER LEIGH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2016
  • INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 05/04/2016; Filing Party: MCNAMARA-JACKSON, KIMBER LEIGH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2016
  • REQUEST - ENTER DEFAULT 05/04/2016; Filing Party: MCNAMARA-JACKSON, KIMBER LEIGH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • PROPERTY DECLARATION - COMMUNITY 02/26/2016; Filing Party: MCNAMARA-JACKSON, KIMBER LEIGH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • PROPERTY DECLARATION - SEPARATE 02/26/2016; Filing Party: MCNAMARA-JACKSON, KIMBER LEIGH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 02/26/2016; Filing Party: MCNAMARA-JACKSON, KIMBER LEIGH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • SUMMONS 02/26/2016; Filing Party: MCNAMARA-JACKSON, KIMBER LEIGH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • PETITION - DISSOLUTION 02/26/2016 Amount:$435.00; Filing Party: MCNAMARA-JACKSON, KIMBER LEIGH

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.