This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 05/04/2022 at 14:44:35 (UTC).

KIM V YOO

Case Summary

On 12/19/2014 KIM filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against YOO. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California. The Judge overseeing this case is PALAFOX, JULIE A.. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1082

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2014

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

Judge Details

Judge

PALAFOX, JULIE A.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mi O. Kim

Petitioner

KIM, MI OK

Defendant

Wook J. Yoo

Respondent

YOO, WOOK JONG

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Christine Chong

Petitioner Attorney

CHONG, CHRISTINE

 

Court Documents

ORDER - ATTEND PARENT EDUCATION / MEDIATION APPOINTMENT 12/19/2014 09:11:00 # Pages:1

ORDER - ATTEND PARENT EDUCATION / MEDIATION APPOINTMENT 12/19/2014 09:11:00 # Pages:1

RFO - CUSTODY / VISITATION 12/19/2014 09:11:00 # Pages:5

RFO - CUSTODY / VISITATION 12/19/2014 09:11:00 # Pages:5

SUMMONS 12/19/2014 09:47:00 # Pages:2

SUMMONS 12/19/2014 09:47:00 # Pages:2

DECLARATION - UNIFORM CUSTODY 12/19/2014 09:47:00 # Pages:2

DECLARATION - UNIFORM CUSTODY 12/19/2014 09:47:00 # Pages:2

NOTICE - RELATED CASE 12/19/2014 09:47:00 # Pages:1

NOTICE - RELATED CASE 12/19/2014 09:47:00 # Pages:1

INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 12/19/2014 09:48:00 # Pages:4

INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 12/19/2014 09:48:00 # Pages:4

PETITION - DISSOLUTION 12/19/2014 09:47:00 # Pages:3

PETITION - DISSOLUTION 12/19/2014 09:47:00 # Pages:3

RESPONSE - DISSOLUTION 01/09/2015 09:23:00 # Pages:3

RESPONSE - DISSOLUTION 01/09/2015 09:23:00 # Pages:3

DECLARATION - UNIFORM CUSTODY 01/09/2015 08:54:00 # Pages:4

DECLARATION - UNIFORM CUSTODY 01/09/2015 08:54:00 # Pages:4

NOTICE - RELATED CASE 01/09/2015 08:55:00 # Pages:1

NOTICE - RELATED CASE 01/09/2015 08:55:00 # Pages:1

RESPONSIVE DECLARATION - REQUEST FOR ORDER 01/09/2015 08:55:00 # Pages:2

RESPONSIVE DECLARATION - REQUEST FOR ORDER 01/09/2015 08:55:00 # Pages:2

ORDER - FEE WAIVER GRANTED BY CLERK 01/09/2015 08:55:00 # Pages:2

ORDER - FEE WAIVER GRANTED BY CLERK 01/09/2015 08:55:00 # Pages:2

DECLARATION - NON APPEARANCE FOR MEDIATION 01/29/2015 16:21:00 # Pages:1

DECLARATION - NON APPEARANCE FOR MEDIATION 01/29/2015 16:21:00 # Pages:1

PROOF OF SERVICE - PERSONAL 01/28/2015 15:21:00 # Pages:1

PROOF OF SERVICE - PERSONAL 01/28/2015 15:21:00 # Pages:1

MINUTE ORDER 02/09/2015 08:45:00 # Pages:1

MINUTE ORDER 02/09/2015 08:45:00 # Pages:1

STIPULATION & ORDER - REQUEST FOR ORDER 02/09/2015 11:50:00 # Pages:3

STIPULATION & ORDER - REQUEST FOR ORDER 02/09/2015 11:50:00 # Pages:3

NOTICE - STATUS CONFERENCE 07/29/2015 12:20:00 GENERATED BY 240 DAY CHECKPOINT CONFERENCE NOTICE # Pages:1

NOTICE - STATUS CONFERENCE 07/29/2015 12:20:00 GENERATED BY 240 DAY CHECKPOINT CONFERENCE NOTICE # Pages:1

MINUTE ORDER - CONTINUANCE 08/27/2015 08:45:00 # Pages:1

MINUTE ORDER - CONTINUANCE 08/27/2015 08:45:00 # Pages:1

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST - DISMISSAL - GRANTED - FULL CASE 01/20/2016; Filing Party: KIM, MI OK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2016
  • HearingDescription: CONFERENCE - CASE RESOLUTION; Department: L65

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2016
  • DocketCONFERENCE - CASE RESOLUTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - CASE RESOLUTION CONFERENCE 12/11/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2015
  • HearingDescription: CONFERENCE - STATUS; Department: L65

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2015
  • DocketCONFERENCE - STATUS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2015
  • HearingDescription: CONFERENCE - STATUS; Department: L65

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2015
  • DocketCONFERENCE - STATUS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER - CONTINUANCE 08/27/2015 08:45:00 # Pages:1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - STATUS CONFERENCE 07/29/2015 12:20:00 GENERATED BY 240 DAY CHECKPOINT CONFERENCE NOTICE # Pages:1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 01/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSIVE DECLARATION - REQUEST FOR ORDER 01/09/2015 08:55:00 # Pages:2; Filing Party: YOO, WOOK JONG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2015
  • DocketREQUEST - WAIVE COURT FEES 01/09/2015 09:23:00 GRANTED # Pages:2; Filing Party: YOO, WOOK JONG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - FEE WAIVER GRANTED BY CLERK 01/09/2015 08:55:00 # Pages:2; Filing Party: YOO, WOOK JONG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - ATTEND PARENT EDUCATION / MEDIATION APPOINTMENT 12/19/2014 09:11:00 # Pages:1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRFO - CUSTODY / VISITATION 12/19/2014 09:11:00 # Pages:5; Filing Party: KIM, MI OK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS 12/19/2014 09:47:00 # Pages:2; Filing Party: KIM, MI OK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION - UNIFORM CUSTODY 12/19/2014 09:47:00 # Pages:2; Filing Party: KIM, MI OK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - RELATED CASE 12/19/2014 09:47:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: KIM, MI OK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 12/19/2014 09:48:00 # Pages:4; Filing Party: KIM, MI OK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION - DISSOLUTION 12/19/2014 09:47:00 # Pages:3; Filing Party: KIM, MI OK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHONG, CHRISTINE