This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 11:47:46 (UTC).

KIM - NAME CHANGE

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 KIM - NAME CHANGE was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners

HYUNG SEOK KIM

HEE JU LEE

 

Court Documents

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER UNASSIGNED ON 02/26/2016.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER UNASSIGNED ON 02/26/2016.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY , HYUNG FOR 141- CERTIFYING A COPY IN THE AMOUNT OF 125.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11982962 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11807047.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY , HYUNG FOR 141- CERTIFYING A COPY IN THE AMOUNT OF 125.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11982962 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11807047.

PETITION FOR CHANGE OF NAME FILED BY KIM, HYUNG SEOK; LEE, HEE JU ON 02/26/2016

PETITION FOR CHANGE OF NAME FILED BY KIM, HYUNG SEOK; LEE, HEE JU ON 02/26/2016

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE CHANGE OF NAME FILED BY KIM, HYUNG SEOK; LEE, HEE JU ON 02/26/2016

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE CHANGE OF NAME FILED BY KIM, HYUNG SEOK; LEE, HEE JU ON 02/26/2016

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR CHANGE OF NAME 06/14/2016 08:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR CHANGE OF NAME 06/14/2016 08:30:00 AM.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY KIM, HYUNG SEOK; LEE, HEE JU ON 02/26/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY KIM, HYUNG SEOK; LEE, HEE JU ON 02/26/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE BY PUBLICATION (AMENDED) FILED BY KIM, HYUNG SEOK ON 04/01/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE BY PUBLICATION (AMENDED) FILED BY KIM, HYUNG SEOK ON 04/01/2016

DECREE CHANGING NAME RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016.

DECREE CHANGING NAME RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY KIM, HYUNG FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927050 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751275.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY KIM, HYUNG FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927050 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751275.

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE CHANGE OF NAME (AMENDED) FILED BY KIM, HYUNG SEOK; LEE, HEE JU ON 03/03/2016

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE CHANGE OF NAME (AMENDED) FILED BY KIM, HYUNG SEOK; LEE, HEE JU ON 03/03/2016

DECREE CHANGING NAME FILED BY KIM, HYUNG SEOK; LEE, HEE JU ON 06/14/2016

DECREE CHANGING NAME FILED BY KIM, HYUNG SEOK; LEE, HEE JU ON 06/14/2016

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR CHANGE OF NAME 06/14/2016 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • PETITION FOR CHANGE OF NAME HAS BEEN GRANTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DECREE CHANGING NAME FILED BY KIM, HYUNG SEOK; LEE, HEE JU ON 06/14/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY , HYUNG FOR 141- CERTIFYING A COPY IN THE AMOUNT OF 125.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11982962 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11807047.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY PUBLICATION (AMENDED) FILED BY KIM, HYUNG SEOK ON 04/01/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE CHANGE OF NAME (AMENDED) FILED BY KIM, HYUNG SEOK; LEE, HEE JU ON 03/03/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY KIM, HYUNG FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927050 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751275.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR CHANGE OF NAME SCHEDULED FOR 06/14/2016 AT 08:30:00 AM IN D100 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER UNASSIGNED ON 02/26/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DECREE CHANGING NAME RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE CHANGE OF NAME FILED BY KIM, HYUNG SEOK; LEE, HEE JU ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY KIM, HYUNG SEOK; LEE, HEE JU ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION FOR CHANGE OF NAME FILED BY KIM, HYUNG SEOK; LEE, HEE JU ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.