This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 03/07/2019 at 08:22:30 (UTC).

KIM COELHO VS JOHN COELHO

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 KIM COELHO filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against JOHN COELHO. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1693

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lamoreaux Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

COELHO, KIM

Respondent

COELHO, JOHN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

DUNCAN, JULIE ANNE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/25/2017
  • JUDGMENT - DISSOLUTION 05/25/2017; Filing Party: COELHO, KIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2017
  • NOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 05/25/2017; Filing Party: COELHO, KIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2017
  • JUDGMENT - FAMILY CODE 2336 05/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • STIPULATION & WAIVERS (NO FEE) 05/24/2017; Filing Party: COELHO, KIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • RETURN SHEET - JUDGMENT 05/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • RETURN SHEET - JUDGMENT 04/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • RETURN SHEET - JUDGMENT 03/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • CONFERENCE - STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • DECLARATION - DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT 01/18/2017; Filing Party: COELHO, KIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • WAIVER - FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 01/18/2017; Filing Party: COELHO, KIM

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 08/10/2016
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY 08/10/2016; Filing Party: COELHO, KIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - MAIL 07/18/2016; Filing Party: COELHO, JOHN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2016
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 07/08/2016; Filing Party: COELHO, JOHN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2016
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 07/08/2016; Filing Party: COELHO, JOHN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2016
  • DECLARATION - UNIFORM CUSTODY 07/08/2016; Filing Party: COELHO, JOHN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2016
  • RESPONSE - DISSOLUTION 07/08/2016 Amount:$435.00; Filing Party: COELHO, JOHN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 02/26/2016; Filing Party: COELHO, KIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • DECLARATION - UNIFORM CUSTODY 02/26/2016; Filing Party: COELHO, KIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • SUMMONS 02/26/2016; Filing Party: COELHO, KIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • PETITION - DISSOLUTION 02/26/2016 Amount:$435.00; Filing Party: COELHO, KIM

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.