This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 09/19/2019 at 20:16:58 (UTC).

KESHEN VS BUFFINGTON LAW FIRM

Case Summary

On 10/30/2017 KESHEN filed a Contract - Professional Negligence lawsuit against BUFFINGTON LAW FIRM. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

MARY ANNE KESHEN

Defendants and Others

ROGER J. BUFFINGTON, ESQ.

BUFFINGTON LAW FIRM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

ANDREW GOLDSMITH, ATTORNEY AT LAW

Defendant and Other Attorneys

ROBIE & MATTHAI

LAW OFFICE OF HENRY B LATORRACA

 

Court Documents

TRIAL BRIEF FILED BY KESHEN, MARY ANNE ON 09/13/2019

TRIAL BRIEF FILED BY KESHEN, MARY ANNE ON 09/13/2019

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR UNDER SUBMISSION RULING 09/11/2019 03:42:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR UNDER SUBMISSION RULING 09/11/2019 03:42:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 09/11/2019 10:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 09/11/2019 10:00:00 AM.

REPLY TO OPPOSITION FILED BY KESHEN, MARY ANNE ON 09/06/2019

REPLY TO OPPOSITION FILED BY KESHEN, MARY ANNE ON 09/06/2019

REPLY TO OPPOSITION FILED BY KESHEN, MARY ANNE ON 09/03/2019

REPLY TO OPPOSITION FILED BY KESHEN, MARY ANNE ON 09/03/2019

REPLY TO OPPOSITION FILED BY KESHEN, MARY ANNE ON 09/03/2019

REPLY TO OPPOSITION FILED BY KESHEN, MARY ANNE ON 09/03/2019

MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS FILED BY KESHEN, MARY ANNE ON 08/23/2019

MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS FILED BY KESHEN, MARY ANNE ON 08/23/2019

OPPOSITION FILED BY BUFFINGTON LAW FIRM ON 08/26/2019

OPPOSITION FILED BY BUFFINGTON LAW FIRM ON 08/26/2019

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1650857 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1650857 REJECTED.

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED ON 08/06/2019

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED ON 08/06/2019

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - REQUESTS NOT REQUIRING A HEARING: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STIPULATION AND ORDER; SERVICE BY POSTING OR PUBLICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12595951 AND RECEIPT NUM

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - REQUESTS NOT REQUIRING A HEARING: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STIPULATION AND ORDER; SERVICE BY POSTING OR PUBLICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12595951 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12420037.

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FILED BY KESHEN, MARY ANNE ON 07/16/2019

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FILED BY KESHEN, MARY ANNE ON 07/16/2019

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 07/31/2019 10:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 07/31/2019 10:00:00 AM.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12593918 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12417977.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12593918 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12417977.

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY KESHEN, MARY ANNE ON 07/22/2019

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY KESHEN, MARY ANNE ON 07/22/2019

MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS FILED BY KESHEN, MARY ANNE ON 07/22/2019

MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS FILED BY KESHEN, MARY ANNE ON 07/22/2019

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - MOTION/NOTICE TO CONTINUE HEARING OR CMC IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12588681 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12412720.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - MOTION/NOTICE TO CONTINUE HEARING OR CMC IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12588681 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12412720.

301 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TRIAL BRIEF FILED BY KESHEN, MARY ANNE ON 09/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 41012443 RECEIVED ON 09/13/2019 05:29:50 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR UNDER SUBMISSION RULING 09/11/2019 03:42:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 09/11/2019 10:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • THE COURT TAKES THIS MATTER UNDER SUBMISSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REPLY TO OPPOSITION FILED BY KESHEN, MARY ANNE ON 09/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 41009773 RECEIVED ON 09/06/2019 03:14:51 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REPLY TO OPPOSITION FILED BY KESHEN, MARY ANNE ON 09/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1662025 RECEIVED ON 09/03/2019 05:13:23 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
511 More Docket Entries
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS (5/9/17) FILED BY KESHEN, MARY ANNE ON 10/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS (5/4/17) FILED BY KESHEN, MARY ANNE ON 10/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL (5/2/17) FILED BY KESHEN, MARY ANNE ON 10/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS (5/2/17) FILED BY KESHEN, MARY ANNE ON 10/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 3/17/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING 3/17/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (3/3/17) FILED BY KESHEN, MARY ANNE ON 10/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET (3/3/17) FILED BY KESHEN, MARY ANNE ON 10/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT (3/3/17) FILED BY KESHEN, MARY ANNE ON 10/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • LEGACY CASE INITIATED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BUFFINGTON LAW FIRM, PC, A BUSINESS OF is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LATORRACA HENRY B.