This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 08:51:53 (UTC).

KENNETH COLLINS VS. THE STEPHOUSE RECOVERY, INC.

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 KENNETH COLLINS filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against THE STEPHOUSE RECOVERY, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Civil Complex Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CXC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civil Complex Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KENNETH COLLINS

COLLEEN KRAMBECK

DENA BLACKWOOD

Defendants

THE STEPHOUSE RECOVERY, INC.

GEORGE JAMES VILAGUT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

NICOLE ROYSDON

GRAHAMHOLLIS APC

Defendant Attorney

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

 

Court Documents

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 11/02/2018 11:27:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 11/02/2018 11:27:00 AM.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1548166 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1548166 REJECTED.

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY VILAGUT, GEORGE JAMES; THE STEPHOUSE RECOVERY, INC. ON 05/04/2016.

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY VILAGUT, GEORGE JAMES; THE STEPHOUSE RECOVERY, INC. ON 05/04/2016.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12012493 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11836575.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12012493 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11836575.

PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY COLLINS, KENNETH ON 02/01/2017

PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY COLLINS, KENNETH ON 02/01/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY COLLINS, KENNETH ON 08/12/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY COLLINS, KENNETH ON 08/12/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY KRAMBECK, COLLEEN; BLACKWOOD, DENA; COLLINS, KENNETH ON 08/14/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY KRAMBECK, COLLEEN; BLACKWOOD, DENA; COLLINS, KENNETH ON 08/14/2017

PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY KRAMBECK, COLLEEN; BLACKWOOD, DENA; COLLINS, KENNETH ON 05/03/2017

PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY KRAMBECK, COLLEEN; BLACKWOOD, DENA; COLLINS, KENNETH ON 05/03/2017

PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY KRAMBECK, COLLEEN; BLACKWOOD, DENA; COLLINS, KENNETH ON 03/21/2019

PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY KRAMBECK, COLLEEN; BLACKWOOD, DENA; COLLINS, KENNETH ON 03/21/2019

PROPOSED ORDER (COVER SHEET) (ELECTRONIC FILING) FILED BY KRAMBECK, COLLEEN; BLACKWOOD, DENA; COLLINS, KENNETH ON 07/19/2018

PROPOSED ORDER (COVER SHEET) (ELECTRONIC FILING) FILED BY KRAMBECK, COLLEEN; BLACKWOOD, DENA; COLLINS, KENNETH ON 07/19/2018

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12430347 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12254026.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12430347 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12254026.

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY VILAGUT, GEORGE JAMES; THE STEPHOUSE RECOVERY, INC. ON 08/19/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY VILAGUT, GEORGE JAMES; THE STEPHOUSE RECOVERY, INC. ON 08/19/2016

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF CLASS SETTLEMENT 09/21/2018 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF CLASS SETTLEMENT 09/21/2018 09:00:00 AM.

STIPULATION AND ORDER FILED BY THE STEPHOUSE RECOVERY, INC. ON 04/02/2019

STIPULATION AND ORDER FILED BY THE STEPHOUSE RECOVERY, INC. ON 04/02/2019

JOINT STATEMENT FILED BY COLLINS, KENNETH ON 08/08/2016

JOINT STATEMENT FILED BY COLLINS, KENNETH ON 08/08/2016

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY FILED BY KRAMBECK, COLLEEN; BLACKWOOD, DENA; COLLINS, KENNETH ON 02/22/2018

NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY FILED BY KRAMBECK, COLLEEN; BLACKWOOD, DENA; COLLINS, KENNETH ON 02/22/2018

STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY COLLINS, KENNETH ON 01/04/2017

STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY COLLINS, KENNETH ON 01/04/2017

148 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION AND ORDER FILED BY THE STEPHOUSE RECOVERY, INC. ON 04/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 04/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER - OTHER FILED BY KRAMBECK, COLLEEN; BLACKWOOD, DENA; COLLINS, KENNETH ON 04/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1604286 RECEIVED ON 03/21/2019 05:07:13 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF STIPULATED SETTLEMENT PER CCP 664.6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • AMENDED COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF STIPULATED SETTLEMENT PER CCP 664.6.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • THE COURT ENTERS JUDGMENT AS TO AMENDED COMPLAINT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12520595 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12344354.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY KRAMBECK, COLLEEN; BLACKWOOD, DENA; COLLINS, KENNETH ON 03/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED ORDER (COVER SHEET) (ELECTRONIC FILING) FILED BY KRAMBECK, COLLEEN; BLACKWOOD, DENA; COLLINS, KENNETH ON 03/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
216 More Docket Entries
  • 03/08/2016
  • THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR 05/25/2016 AT 08:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT CX102.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • THE COURT DEEMS THIS CASE EXCEPTIONAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 05/25/2016 AT 08:30:00 AM IN CX102 AT CIVIL COMPLEX CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER CLASTER, WILLIAM ON 02/26/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 34 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - PLAINTIFF IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11928578 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11752796.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • SURETY NOT IN GOOD STANDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY COLLINS, KENNETH ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY COLLINS, KENNETH ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY COLLINS, KENNETH ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1306978 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 11:55:58 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.