This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 11:51:43 (UTC).

KENNEDY MARKETING GROUP, INC. VS. MAJID KAMFIROOZIE

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 KENNEDY MARKETING GROUP, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MAJID KAMFIROOZIE. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KENNEDY MARKETING GROUP, INC.

Defendants

WESTCOTT ENTERPRISES, INC.

MAJID KAMFIROOZIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEE & HAYES, PLLC

Defendant Attorney

COLTON LAW GROUP

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY KENNEDY MARKETING GROUP, INC. ON 02/26/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY KENNEDY MARKETING GROUP, INC. ON 02/26/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY KENNEDY MARKETING GROUP, INC. ON 05/09/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY KENNEDY MARKETING GROUP, INC. ON 05/09/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY KENNEDY MARKETING GROUP, INC. ON 02/26/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY KENNEDY MARKETING GROUP, INC. ON 02/26/2016

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 03/20/2017 01:30:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 03/20/2017 01:30:00 PM.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY KENNEDY MARKETING GROUP, INC. ON 05/19/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY KENNEDY MARKETING GROUP, INC. ON 05/19/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 173 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K, 173 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 450.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12033421 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11857414.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 173 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K, 173 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 450.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12033421 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11857414.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY KENNEDY MARKETING GROUP, INC. ON 09/27/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY KENNEDY MARKETING GROUP, INC. ON 09/27/2016

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY KAMFIROOZIE, MAJID; WESTCOTT ENTERPRISES, INC. ON 09/21/2016

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY KAMFIROOZIE, MAJID; WESTCOTT ENTERPRISES, INC. ON 09/21/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONETOUCHLEGAL FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927402 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751627.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONETOUCHLEGAL FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927402 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751627.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 12/19/2016 01:30:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 12/19/2016 01:30:00 PM.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4597095 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4597095 REJECTED.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 12/19/2016 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C03 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 12/19/2016 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C03 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL OC GENERATED

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL OC GENERATED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY KENNEDY MARKETING GROUP, INC. ON 02/26/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY KENNEDY MARKETING GROUP, INC. ON 02/26/2016

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL 05/10/2017 01:30:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL 05/10/2017 01:30:00 PM.

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL 05/10/2017 01:30:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • COURT ORDERS THE ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT DISMISSAL- LACK OF PROSECUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT DISMISSAL- LACK OF PROSECUTION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL OC GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 03/20/2017 01:30:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL IS SCHEDULED FOR 05/10/2017 AT 01:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT C3.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL SCHEDULED FOR 05/10/2017 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C03 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 12/19/2016 01:30:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2016
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE CONTINUED TO 03/20/2017 AT 01:30 PM IN THIS DEPARTMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 09/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4597095 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY KENNEDY MARKETING GROUP, INC. ON 05/19/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3415936 RECEIVED ON 05/19/2016 04:43:48 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY KENNEDY MARKETING GROUP, INC. ON 05/09/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4544722 RECEIVED ON 05/09/2016 03:27:28 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONETOUCHLEGAL FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927402 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751627.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY KENNEDY MARKETING GROUP, INC. ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY KENNEDY MARKETING GROUP, INC. ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY KENNEDY MARKETING GROUP, INC. ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3385045 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 08:48:18 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less