This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 05/11/2017 at 06:28:21 (UTC).

KEN AGID VS. SILVER BRONZE CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 10/20/2014 KEN AGID filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SILVER BRONZE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2014

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PHIL MARTIN

KEN AGID

JOSEPH HART

Defendants

RANDY JOHNSON

ROBERT ATKINS

SILVER BRONZE CORPORATION

WILLIAM RADOVICH

THEODORA ORINGHER PC

Interested Party and Intervenor

OAK GROVE LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

WOLDER & ASSOCIATES, APC

WATTS LAW APLC

Defendant Attorneys

BARIC & ASSOCIATES

THEODORA ORINGHER PC

Interested Party and Intervenor Attorney

O'MELVENY & MYERS LLP

 

Court Documents

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4331557 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4331557 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1199580 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1199580 REJECTED.

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY AGID, KEN; HART, JOSEPH; MARTIN, PHIL ON 02/05/2015

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY AGID, KEN; HART, JOSEPH; MARTIN, PHIL ON 02/05/2015

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11731189 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11555434.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11731189 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11555434.

ORDER - OTHER (TO DISMISS) FILED BY AGID, KEN; HART, JOSEPH; MARTIN, PHIL ON 01/30/2015

ORDER - OTHER (TO DISMISS) FILED BY AGID, KEN; HART, JOSEPH; MARTIN, PHIL ON 01/30/2015

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR NUNC PRO TUNC MINUTES 02/02/2015 11:01:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR NUNC PRO TUNC MINUTES 02/02/2015 11:01:00 AM.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL OC GENERATED

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL OC GENERATED

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 02/02/2015 10:54:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 02/02/2015 10:54:00 AM.

PROPOSED ORDER (COVER SHEET) (ELECTRONIC FILING) FILED BY AGID, KEN; HART, JOSEPH; MARTIN, PHIL ON 01/28/2015

PROPOSED ORDER (COVER SHEET) (ELECTRONIC FILING) FILED BY AGID, KEN; HART, JOSEPH; MARTIN, PHIL ON 01/28/2015

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY AGID, KEN; HART, JOSEPH; MARTIN, PHIL ON 01/28/2015

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY AGID, KEN; HART, JOSEPH; MARTIN, PHIL ON 01/28/2015

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 01/28/2015

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 01/28/2015

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 37 - REQUESTS NOT REQUIRING A HEARING: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STIPULATION AND ORDER; SERVICE BY POSTING OR PUBLICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11725986 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11550

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 37 - REQUESTS NOT REQUIRING A HEARING: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STIPULATION AND ORDER; SERVICE BY POSTING OR PUBLICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11725986 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11550248.

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FILED BY AGID, KEN; HART, JOSEPH; MARTIN, PHIL ON 01/22/2015

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FILED BY AGID, KEN; HART, JOSEPH; MARTIN, PHIL ON 01/22/2015

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY RADOVICH, WILLIAM ON 01/16/2015

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY RADOVICH, WILLIAM ON 01/16/2015

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY JOHNSON, RANDY ON 01/16/2015

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY JOHNSON, RANDY ON 01/16/2015

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY ATKINS, ROBERT ON 01/16/2015

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY ATKINS, ROBERT ON 01/16/2015

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY SILVER BRONZE CORPORATION ON 01/16/2015

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY SILVER BRONZE CORPORATION ON 01/16/2015

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11706505 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11530828.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11706505 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11530828.

62 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4331557 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1199580 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF RULING FILED BY AGID, KEN; HART, JOSEPH; MARTIN, PHIL ON 02/05/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2015
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1227657 RECEIVED ON 02/05/2015 12:45:31 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11731189 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11555434.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER (TO DISMISS) FILED BY AGID, KEN; HART, JOSEPH; MARTIN, PHIL ON 01/30/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2015
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1224619 RECEIVED ON 01/28/2015 11:57:56 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR NUNC PRO TUNC MINUTES 02/02/2015 11:01:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2015
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER DATED 02/02/2015 CORRECTED NUNC PRO TUNC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL OC GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
99 More Docket Entries
  • 10/28/2014
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 4270252 RECEIVED ON 10/28/2014 04:01:11 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 10/28/2014 04:13:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2014
  • DocketJOHN GASTELUM RECUSED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 10/28/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER GASTELUM, JOHN ON 10/20/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11679004 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11503168.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY AGID, KEN; HART, JOSEPH; MARTIN, PHIL ON 10/20/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY AGID, KEN; HART, JOSEPH; MARTIN, PHIL ON 10/20/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY AGID, KEN; HART, JOSEPH; MARTIN, PHIL ON 10/20/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2014
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 4265185 RECEIVED ON 10/20/2014 02:22:26 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WWC l lp dba Oak Grove is a litigant

Latest cases where THEODORA ORINGHER PC is a litigant