Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/05/2020 at 06:50:46 (UTC).

KELTERITE CORPORATION VS. TORRES CONSTRUCTION CORP.

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 KELTERITE CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against TORRES CONSTRUCTION CORP. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kelterite Corporation

Defendants

Ismael Torres

Torres Construction Corp.

Suretec Indemnity Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Devirian & Shinmoto Professional Corporation

Defendant Attorney

Gascou Hopkins LLP

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 173 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12726905 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12552884.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 173 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12726905 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12552884.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY SURETEC INDEMNITY COMPANY ON 02/27/2020

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY SURETEC INDEMNITY COMPANY ON 02/27/2020

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY KELTERITE CORPORATION ON 03/10/2020

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY KELTERITE CORPORATION ON 03/10/2020

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12697110 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12522129.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12697110 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12522129.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY KELTERITE CORPORATION ON 01/22/2020

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY KELTERITE CORPORATION ON 01/22/2020

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY KELTERITE CORPORATION ON 01/22/2020

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY KELTERITE CORPORATION ON 01/22/2020

COMPLAINT FILED BY KELTERITE CORPORATION ON 01/22/2020

COMPLAINT FILED BY KELTERITE CORPORATION ON 01/22/2020

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 173 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12726905 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12552884.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1725056 RECEIVED ON 02/27/2020 12:25:47 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2901092 RECEIVED ON 03/10/2020 04:03:17 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY KELTERITE CORPORATION ON 03/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY SURETEC INDEMNITY COMPANY ON 02/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12697110 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12522129.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2883081 RECEIVED ON 01/22/2020 05:28:35 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY KELTERITE CORPORATION ON 01/22/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY KELTERITE CORPORATION ON 01/22/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY KELTERITE CORPORATION ON 01/22/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TORRES CONSTRUCTION CORP. A CALIF. CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases where KELTERITE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where SURETEC INDEMNITY COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant