This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/08/2017 at 07:39:25 (UTC).

KAWASAKI MOTORS FINANCE CORPORATION VS. J & J MOTORSPORTS INC.

Case Summary

On 04/14/2011 KAWASAKI MOTORS FINANCE CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against J J MOTORSPORTS INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2011

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KAWASAKI MOTORS FINANCE CORPORATION

Defendants

J & J MOTORSPORTS INC.

MARCELLA F HAUBNER

JASON G HAUBNER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BUNTING DRAYTON & ALWARD LLP

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 166 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 395.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10883323 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10707215.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 166 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 395.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10883323 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10707215.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (JUDGMENT PACKET) FILED BY KAWASAKI MOTORS FINANCE CORPORATION ON 11/08/2011

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (JUDGMENT PACKET) FILED BY KAWASAKI MOTORS FINANCE CORPORATION ON 11/08/2011

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY KAWASAKI MOTORS FINANCE CORPORATION ON 11/08/2011

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY KAWASAKI MOTORS FINANCE CORPORATION ON 11/08/2011

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY KAWASAKI MOTORS FINANCE CORPORATION ON 10/06/2011

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY KAWASAKI MOTORS FINANCE CORPORATION ON 10/06/2011

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR DEFAULT PROVE-UP HEARING 12/02/2011 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR DEFAULT PROVE-UP HEARING 12/02/2011 09:00:00 AM.

JUDGMENT FILED BY KAWASAKI MOTORS FINANCE CORPORATION ON 12/09/2011

JUDGMENT FILED BY KAWASAKI MOTORS FINANCE CORPORATION ON 12/09/2011

ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND RECEIPT FILED BY KAWASAKI MOTORS FINANCE CORPORATION ON 04/29/2011

ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND RECEIPT FILED BY KAWASAKI MOTORS FINANCE CORPORATION ON 04/29/2011

COMPLAINT FILED BY KAWASAKI MOTORS FINANCE CORPORATION ON 04/14/2011

COMPLAINT FILED BY KAWASAKI MOTORS FINANCE CORPORATION ON 04/14/2011

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY KAWASAKI MOTORS FINANCE CORPORATION ON 11/08/2011

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY KAWASAKI MOTORS FINANCE CORPORATION ON 11/08/2011

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY KAWASAKI MOTORS FINANCE CORPORATION ON 07/11/2011

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY KAWASAKI MOTORS FINANCE CORPORATION ON 07/11/2011

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 12/09/2011 11:44:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 12/09/2011 11:44:00 AM.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY KAWASAKI MOTORS FINANCE CORPORATION ON 10/03/2011

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY KAWASAKI MOTORS FINANCE CORPORATION ON 10/03/2011

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY KAWASAKI MOTORS FINANCE CORPORATION ON 08/16/2011

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY KAWASAKI MOTORS FINANCE CORPORATION ON 08/16/2011

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER FIRMAT, FRANCISCO ON 04/14/2011.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER FIRMAT, FRANCISCO ON 04/14/2011.

JUDGMENT (COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT PACKET) SUBMITTED BY KAWASAKI MOTORS FINANCE CORPORATION REJECTED ON 11/01/2011.

JUDGMENT (COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT PACKET) SUBMITTED BY KAWASAKI MOTORS FINANCE CORPORATION REJECTED ON 11/01/2011.

ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND RECEIPT FILED BY KAWASAKI MOTORS FINANCE CORPORATION ON 04/29/2011

ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND RECEIPT FILED BY KAWASAKI MOTORS FINANCE CORPORATION ON 04/29/2011

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 10/21/2011 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C15 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 10/21/2011 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C15 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY KAWASAKI MOTORS FINANCE CORPORATION ON 09/22/2011

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY KAWASAKI MOTORS FINANCE CORPORATION ON 09/22/2011

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2011
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2011
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2011
  • THE COURT ENTERS JUDGMENT AS TO COMPLAINT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT FILED BY KAWASAKI MOTORS FINANCE CORPORATION ON 12/09/2011

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY KAWASAKI MOTORS FINANCE CORPORATION ON 11/08/2011

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY KAWASAKI MOTORS FINANCE CORPORATION ON 11/08/2011

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 12/09/2011 11:44:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 12/09/2011 11:44:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR DEFAULT PROVE-UP HEARING 12/02/2011 09:00:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2011
  • MATTER TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 08/16/2011
  • DRAP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY KAWASAKI MOTORS FINANCE CORPORATION ON 07/11/2011

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND RECEIPT FILED BY KAWASAKI MOTORS FINANCE CORPORATION ON 04/29/2011

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND RECEIPT FILED BY KAWASAKI MOTORS FINANCE CORPORATION ON 04/29/2011

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND RECEIPT FILED BY KAWASAKI MOTORS FINANCE CORPORATION ON 04/29/2011

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 166 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 395.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10883323 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10707215.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER FIRMAT, FRANCISCO ON 04/14/2011.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY KAWASAKI MOTORS FINANCE CORPORATION ON 04/14/2011

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY KAWASAKI MOTORS FINANCE CORPORATION ON 04/14/2011

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY KAWASAKI MOTORS FINANCE CORPORATION ON 04/14/2011

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less