This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 03/11/2019 at 06:18:12 (UTC).

KATHY ROLDAN VS JEREMY ESPINOZA

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 a Family - Domestic Partnership Dissolution/Divorce case was filed by KATHY ROLDAN against JEREMY ESPINOZA in the jurisdiction of Orange County Superior Courts, Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2497

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Undetermined

  • Case Type:

    Family - Domestic Partnership Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lamoreaux Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

Judge Details

HENSON, CAROL L.

 

Party Details

Others

ESPINOZA, JEREMY

ROLDAN, KATHY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2017
  • MINUTE ORDER 12/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • HEARING - DOMESTIC VIOLENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • MINUTE ORDER 11/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • DV ORDER - REQUEST TO CONTINUE 11/17/2017; Filing Party: ROLDAN, KATHY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • HEARING - DOMESTIC VIOLENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • MINUTE ORDER 10/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • ACCEPT - WILSON - STIP TO COMMISSIONER - ALL PURPOSES 10/26/2017; Filing Party: ROLDAN, KATHY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • DV ORDER - REQUEST TO CONTINUE 10/26/2017; Filing Party: ROLDAN, KATHY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • HEARING - DOMESTIC VIOLENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • ORDER - TRANSPORT / REMOVAL 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 10/10/2017; Filing Party: ROLDAN, KATHY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DV REQUEST - RESTRAINING ORDER 10/10/2017; Filing Party: ROLDAN, KATHY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DV TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER 10/10/2017; Filing Party: ROLDAN, KATHY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DV NOTICE - COURT HEARING DOMESTIC VIOLENCE 10/10/2017; Filing Party: ROLDAN, KATHY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • HEARING - EX PARTE - DOMESTIC VIOLENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • EX PARTE REQUEST - DOMESTIC VIOLENCE 10/10/2017; Filing Party: ROLDAN, KATHY

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.