This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 12/26/2021 at 04:58:09 (UTC).

KASRA ROWSHAN VS. DAMIEN BURGESS

Case Summary

On 02/18/2016 KASRA ROWSHAN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against DAMIEN BURGESS. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

KASRA ROWSHAN

GRANT ROBICHEAUX

NEWPORT CARE MEDICAL GROUP, INC.

SOHRAB ROWSHAN

R & R ACCOUNTING AND TAX SERVICES, CORPORATION

Other and Defendant

DAMIEN BURGESS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

LEVINSON ARSHONSKY & KURTZ, LLP

Other and Defendant Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF STEVEN GOLDSOBEL, A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION

 

Court Documents

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY BURGESS, DAMIEN ON 05/13/2016

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY BURGESS, DAMIEN ON 05/13/2016

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY ROBICHEAUX, GRANT; ROWSHAN, KASRA; NEWPORT CARE MEDICAL GROUP, INC. ON 01/05/2017

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY ROBICHEAUX, GRANT; ROWSHAN, KASRA; NEWPORT CARE MEDICAL GROUP, INC. ON 01/05/2017

COMPLAINT FILED BY ROWSHAN, KASRA; ROBICHEAUX, GRANT; NEWPORT CARE MEDICAL GROUP, INC. ON 02/18/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY ROWSHAN, KASRA; ROBICHEAUX, GRANT; NEWPORT CARE MEDICAL GROUP, INC. ON 02/18/2016

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4603247 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4603247 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4607109 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4607109 REJECTED.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 12/05/2016 02:32:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 12/05/2016 02:32:00 PM.

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY ROBICHEAUX, GRANT; ROWSHAN, KASRA; NEWPORT CARE MEDICAL GROUP, INC. ON 12/05/2016

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY ROBICHEAUX, GRANT; ROWSHAN, KASRA; NEWPORT CARE MEDICAL GROUP, INC. ON 12/05/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12045195 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11869160.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12045195 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11869160.

STIPULATION AND ORDER (TO CONTINUE THE HEARING DATE ON DEFENDANT DAMIEN BURGESS'S MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA) FILED BY ROBICHEAUX, GRANT; ROWSHAN, KASRA; NEWPORT CARE MEDICAL GROUP, INC. ON 10/13/2016

STIPULATION AND ORDER (TO CONTINUE THE HEARING DATE ON DEFENDANT DAMIEN BURGESS'S MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA) FILED BY ROBICHEAUX, GRANT; ROWSHAN, KASRA; NEWPORT CARE MEDICAL GROUP, INC. ON 10/13/2016

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 10/13/2016 03:35:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 10/13/2016 03:35:00 PM.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12043287 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11867252.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12043287 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11867252.

STIPULATION AND ORDER (TO CONTINUE THE HEARING DATE ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO THEIR REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS) FILED BY ROBICHEAUX, GRANT; ROWSHAN, KASRA; NEWPORT CARE MEDICAL GROUP, INC. ON 10/07/2016

STIPULATION AND ORDER (TO CONTINUE THE HEARING DATE ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO THEIR REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS) FILED BY ROBICHEAUX, GRANT; ROWSHAN, KASRA; NEWPORT CARE MEDICAL GROUP, INC. ON 10/07/2016

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 10/07/2016 11:34:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 10/07/2016 11:34:00 AM.

ANSWER TO AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY ROWSHAN, KASRA; ROBICHEAUX, GRANT; NEWPORT CARE MEDICAL GROUP, INC.; ROWSHAN, SOHRAB; R & R ACCOUNTING AND TAX SERVICES, CORPORATION ON 10/07/2016

ANSWER TO AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY ROWSHAN, KASRA; ROBICHEAUX, GRANT; NEWPORT CARE MEDICAL GROUP, INC.; ROWSHAN, SOHRAB; R & R ACCOUNTING AND TAX SERVICES, CORPORATION ON 10/07/2016

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 10/06/2016

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 10/06/2016

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 10/06/2016

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 10/06/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12032709 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11856714.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12032709 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11856714.

52 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4603247 REJECTED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4607109 REJECTED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 4657847 RECEIVED ON 01/05/2017 02:22:36 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • DocketCASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • DocketAMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY ROBICHEAUX, GRANT; ROWSHAN, KASRA; NEWPORT CARE MEDICAL GROUP, INC. ON 01/05/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 12/05/2016 02:32:00 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2016
  • DocketTHE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE IS SCHEDULED FOR 01/19/2017 AT 08:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT C-20.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
88 More Docket Entries
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY ROBICHEAUX, GRANT; ROWSHAN, KASRA; NEWPORT CARE MEDICAL GROUP, INC. ON 02/24/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 4508428 RECEIVED ON 02/24/2016 02:04:34 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ROBICHEAUX, GRANT; ROWSHAN, KASRA; NEWPORT CARE MEDICAL GROUP, INC. ON 02/23/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2445549 RECEIVED ON 02/23/2016 11:21:09 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3383625 REJECTED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11924215 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11748423.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2444655 RECEIVED ON 02/18/2016 04:39:06 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER CHAFFEE, DAVID ON 02/18/2016.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ROWSHAN, KASRA; ROBICHEAUX, GRANT; NEWPORT CARE MEDICAL GROUP, INC. ON 02/18/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY ROWSHAN, KASRA; ROBICHEAUX, GRANT; NEWPORT CARE MEDICAL GROUP, INC. ON 02/18/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NEWPORT CARE MEDICAL GROUP INC. is a litigant