This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 03/07/2019 at 08:21:59 (UTC).

KARLSTEN YAGO VS ANGELA YAGO

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 KARLSTEN YAGO filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against ANGELA YAGO. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1683

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lamoreaux Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

YAGO, KARLSTEN

Respondent

YAGO, ANGELA THOMAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

BECKMAN, KAREN HARLIG

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2017
  • WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY 03/14/2017; Filing Party: YAGO, KARLSTEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - MAIL 02/09/2017; Filing Party: YAGO, KARLSTEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • DECLARATION - DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT 02/02/2017; Filing Party: YAGO, KARLSTEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • NOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 02/02/2017; Filing Party: YAGO, KARLSTEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • JUDGMENT - DISSOLUTION 02/02/2017; Filing Party: YAGO, KARLSTEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • JUDGMENT - FAMILY CODE 2336 02/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • CONFERENCE - STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • RETURN SHEET - EXPEDITED JUDGMENT 01/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2017
  • WAIVER - FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 01/17/2017; Filing Party: YAGO, KARLSTEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2017
  • STIPULATION & WAIVERS (NO FEE) 01/17/2017; Filing Party: YAGO, KARLSTEN

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 08/03/2016
  • REQUEST - WAIVE COURT FEES 08/03/2016; Filing Party: YAGO, ANGELA THOMAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - MAIL 08/03/2016; Filing Party: YAGO, ANGELA THOMAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2016
  • RESPONSE - DISSOLUTION 08/03/2016 Amount:$435.00; Filing Party: YAGO, ANGELA THOMAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - MAIL 07/12/2016; Filing Party: YAGO, KARLSTEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - MAIL 06/27/2016; Filing Party: YAGO, KARLSTEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2016
  • DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 06/27/2016 Preliminary; Filing Party: YAGO, KARLSTEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 03/21/2016; Filing Party: YAGO, KARLSTEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 02/26/2016; Filing Party: YAGO, KARLSTEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • SUMMONS 02/26/2016; Filing Party: YAGO, KARLSTEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • PETITION - DISSOLUTION 02/26/2016 Amount:$435.00; Filing Party: YAGO, KARLSTEN

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.