This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 03/07/2023 at 03:43:41 (UTC).

KAREN ROSE VS. DOE 1

Case Summary

On 12/23/2022 KAREN ROSE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against DOE 1. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County West Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-WJC

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Karen Rose

Defendant

Doe 1

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Herman Law

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY ROSE, KAREN ON 12/23/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY ROSE, KAREN ON 12/23/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ROSE, KAREN ON 12/23/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ROSE, KAREN ON 12/23/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ROSE, KAREN ON 12/23/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ROSE, KAREN ON 12/23/2022

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13156950 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12985047.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13156950 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12985047.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 08/03/2023 AT 01:30:00 PM IN W15 AT WEST JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 08/03/2023 AT 01:30:00 PM IN W15 AT WEST JUSTICE CENTER.

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 03/01/2023

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 03/01/2023

EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY ROSE, KAREN ON 03/01/2023

EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY ROSE, KAREN ON 03/01/2023

NOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY ROSE, KAREN ON 03/01/2023

NOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY ROSE, KAREN ON 03/01/2023

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY NATIONWIDE FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13185759 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13013886.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY NATIONWIDE FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13185759 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13013886.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2023
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: LEE; Department: W15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • HearingDescription: EX PARTE; Judge: LEE; Department: W15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketEX PARTE SCHEDULED FOR 03/02/2023 AT 01:30:00 PM IN W15 AT WEST JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY NATIONWIDE FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13185759 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13013886.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY ROSE, KAREN ON 03/01/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketDECLARATION - OTHER RECEIVED ON 03/01/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY ROSE, KAREN ON 03/01/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21279040 RECEIVED ON 03/01/2023 01:14:59 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 03/01/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 08/03/2023 AT 01:30:00 PM IN W15 AT WEST JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13156950 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12985047.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31248747 RECEIVED ON 12/23/2022 01:41:00 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER LEE, RICHARD ON 12/23/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ROSE, KAREN ON 12/23/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ROSE, KAREN ON 12/23/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY ROSE, KAREN ON 12/23/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less