This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 02/23/2019 at 06:41:15 (UTC).

KARANDE V NAPHADE

Case Summary

On 12/18/2012 KARANDE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against NAPHADE. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1766

  • Filing Date:

    12/18/2012

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lamoreaux Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

KARANDE, SAGAR

Respondent

NAPHADE, SWATI

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/27/2013
  • JUDGMENT 03/27/2013 13:46:00 # Pages:25; Filing Party: KARANDE, SAGAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • NOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 03/27/2013 13:49:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: KARANDE, SAGAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 03/27/2013 11:02:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: KARANDE, SAGAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 03/27/2013 11:02:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: NAPHADE, SWATI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • JUDGMENT - FAMILY CODE 2336 03/27/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2013
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - PERSONAL 02/20/2013 11:17:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: KARANDE, SAGAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2013
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - PERSONAL 02/20/2013 12:09:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: NAPHADE, SWATI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2013
  • APPEARANCE, STIPULATION & WAIVERS (CONVERSION) 02/20/2013 12:07:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: KARANDE, SAGAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2013
  • WAIVER - FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 02/20/2013 12:06:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: KARANDE, SAGAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2013
  • DECLARATION - DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT 02/20/2013 10:57:00 # Pages:3; Filing Party: KARANDE, SAGAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2013
  • INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 02/20/2013 10:57:00 # Pages:4; Filing Party: NAPHADE, SWATI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2013
  • RESPONSE - DISSOLUTION 01/18/2013 13:02:00 # Pages:3; Filing Party: NAPHADE, SWATI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2012
  • INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 12/18/2012 13:23:00 # Pages:4; Filing Party: KARANDE, SAGAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2012
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 12/18/2012 13:23:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: KARANDE, SAGAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2012
  • SUMMONS 12/18/2012 13:23:00 # Pages:2; Filing Party: KARANDE, SAGAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2012
  • PETITION - DISSOLUTION 12/18/2012 13:23:00 # Pages:3; Filing Party: KARANDE, SAGAR

    Read MoreRead Less