This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/03/2021 at 07:46:42 (UTC).

K & S AIR CONDITIONING, INC. VS. AUSTIN BUILDING AND DESIGN, INC.

Case Summary

On 01/19/2021 K S AIR CONDITIONING, INC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against AUSTIN BUILDING AND DESIGN, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

K & S Air Conditioning, Inc.

Defendants

S3 Hospitality, LLC

First Choice Bank

National Union Fire Company of Pittsburgh, PA

Austin Building and Design, Inc.

East West Bank

Mercantile Capital Corporation

Deep Sea Hospitality, LLC

Mercantile Capital Corporation, a Florida corporation

Austin Building and Design, Inc., a Delaware corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Law Office of Mitchell B. Hannah

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12865522 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12693201.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12865522 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12693201.

STIPULATION AND ORDER FILED BY K & S AIR CONDITIONING, INC. ON 03/29/2021

STIPULATION AND ORDER FILED BY K & S AIR CONDITIONING, INC. ON 03/29/2021

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 03/23/2021

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 03/23/2021

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (RE: MERCANTILE CAPITAL CORPORATION) FILED BY K & S AIR CONDITIONING, INC. ON 03/22/2021

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (RE: MERCANTILE CAPITAL CORPORATION) FILED BY K & S AIR CONDITIONING, INC. ON 03/22/2021

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (RE: AUSTIN BUILDING AND DESIGN, INC.) FILED BY K & S AIR CONDITIONING, INC. ON 03/22/2021

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (RE: AUSTIN BUILDING AND DESIGN, INC.) FILED BY K & S AIR CONDITIONING, INC. ON 03/22/2021

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT RECEIVED ON 02/10/2021.

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT RECEIVED ON 02/10/2021.

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT RECEIVED ON 02/10/2021.

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT RECEIVED ON 02/10/2021.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY K & S AIR CONDITIONING, INC. ON 03/15/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY K & S AIR CONDITIONING, INC. ON 03/15/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY K & S AIR CONDITIONING, INC. ON 03/15/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY K & S AIR CONDITIONING, INC. ON 03/15/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY K & S AIR CONDITIONING, INC. ON 03/15/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY K & S AIR CONDITIONING, INC. ON 03/15/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY K & S AIR CONDITIONING, INC. ON 03/15/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY K & S AIR CONDITIONING, INC. ON 03/15/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY K & S AIR CONDITIONING, INC. ON 03/15/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY K & S AIR CONDITIONING, INC. ON 03/15/2021

JURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 09/18/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C23 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

JURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 09/18/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C23 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION FILED BY K & S AIR CONDITIONING, INC. ON 02/01/2021

NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION FILED BY K & S AIR CONDITIONING, INC. ON 02/01/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12833825 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12661199.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12833825 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12661199.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY K & S AIR CONDITIONING, INC. ON 01/19/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY K & S AIR CONDITIONING, INC. ON 01/19/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY K & S AIR CONDITIONING, INC. ON 01/19/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY K & S AIR CONDITIONING, INC. ON 01/19/2021

COMPLAINT FILED BY K & S AIR CONDITIONING, INC. ON 01/19/2021

COMPLAINT FILED BY K & S AIR CONDITIONING, INC. ON 01/19/2021

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2023
  • HearingDescription: JURY TRIAL; Judge: HUNT; Department: C23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12865522 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12693201.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2997638 RECEIVED ON 03/23/2021 01:56:17 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION AND ORDER FILED BY K & S AIR CONDITIONING, INC. ON 03/29/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 03/23/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (RE: MERCANTILE CAPITAL CORPORATION) FILED BY K & S AIR CONDITIONING, INC. ON 03/22/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (RE: AUSTIN BUILDING AND DESIGN, INC.) FILED BY K & S AIR CONDITIONING, INC. ON 03/22/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1811749 RECEIVED ON 02/10/2021 04:58:17 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY K & S AIR CONDITIONING, INC. ON 03/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1822451 RECEIVED ON 03/15/2021 11:34:33 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT RECEIVED ON 02/10/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 09/18/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C23 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3976923 RECEIVED ON 02/01/2021 05:03:23 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION FILED BY K & S AIR CONDITIONING, INC. ON 02/01/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12833825 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12661199.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3972310 RECEIVED ON 01/18/2021 03:35:37 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER HUNT, DEREK ON 01/19/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY K & S AIR CONDITIONING, INC. ON 01/19/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY K & S AIR CONDITIONING, INC. ON 01/19/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY K & S AIR CONDITIONING, INC. ON 01/19/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Mercantile Capital Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where S3 Hospitality LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where AUSTIN BUILDING & DESIGN DBA THE AUSTIN COMPANY AN OHIO CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where K & S AIR CONDITIONING INC. is a litigant