This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 05/05/2020 at 21:44:28 (UTC).

K. HOVNANIAN COMMUNITIES, INC. VS. STONE, ETC.

Case Summary

On 07/03/2017 K HOVNANIAN COMMUNITIES, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against STONE, ETC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Civil Complex Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CXC

  • Filing Date:

    07/03/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

K. HOVNANIAN COMMUNITIES, INC.

K. HOVNANIAN COMPANIES OF CALIFORNIA, INC.

Defendants

MONSCHEIN INDUSTRIES, INC.

R & S MADRIGAL

RUSSELL E. BRANTON, INC.

AQUATIC, CO.

SO CAL WEATHERSTRIP, INC.

MICKEY WALL PAINTING, INC.

PINNACLE PLASTERING, INC.

RSI PROFESSIONAL CABINET SOLUTIONS, INC

CLEARVIEW WINDOWS & DOORS, INC.

AMERICAN WESTERN DOOR & TRIM, INC.

IKE'S LANDSCAPE, INC.

CHAMPION WINDOWS, INC.

STONE, ETC.

D.C. BROWN C & P, INC.

CAPITAL CITY DRYWALL, INC.

BANKER INSULATION OF CALIFORNIA, INC.

CLARK GRADING, INC.

CREATIVE DESIGN INTERIORS, INC.

50 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COLLINSWORTH SPECHT & CALKINS LLP

Defendant Attorney

MOKRI VANIS & JONES, LLP

Other Attorneys

HINES HAMPTON, LLP

KENNEDY & SOUZA, APC

ROBERTSON & ASSOCIATES, APC

HORTON, OBERRECHT, KIRKPATRICK & MARTHA

TROUTMAN SANDERS LLP

Kutak Rock LLP

Petersen-Dean, Inc.

HORTON, OBERRECHT, KIRKPATRICK & MARTH

 

Court Documents

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2785484 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2785484 REJECTED.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY K. HOVNANIAN COMMUNITIES, INC.; K. HOVNANIAN COMPANIES OF CALIFORNIA, INC. ON 04/08/2019

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY K. HOVNANIAN COMMUNITIES, INC.; K. HOVNANIAN COMPANIES OF CALIFORNIA, INC. ON 04/08/2019

APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY K. HOVNANIAN COMMUNITIES, INC.; K. HOVNANIAN COMPANIES OF CALIFORNIA, INC. ON 11/05/2018

APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY K. HOVNANIAN COMMUNITIES, INC.; K. HOVNANIAN COMPANIES OF CALIFORNIA, INC. ON 11/05/2018

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2706062 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2706062 REJECTED.

DECLARATION OF DUE DILIGENCE FILED BY K. HOVNANIAN COMMUNITIES, INC.; K. HOVNANIAN COMPANIES OF CALIFORNIA, INC. ON 08/27/2018

DECLARATION OF DUE DILIGENCE FILED BY K. HOVNANIAN COMMUNITIES, INC.; K. HOVNANIAN COMPANIES OF CALIFORNIA, INC. ON 08/27/2018

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY K. HOVNANIAN COMMUNITIES, INC.; K. HOVNANIAN COMPANIES OF CALIFORNIA, INC. ON 07/09/2018

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY K. HOVNANIAN COMMUNITIES, INC.; K. HOVNANIAN COMPANIES OF CALIFORNIA, INC. ON 07/09/2018

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (DOE 10) FILED BY K. HOVNANIAN COMMUNITIES, INC.; K. HOVNANIAN COMPANIES OF CALIFORNIA, INC. ON 05/23/2018

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (DOE 10) FILED BY K. HOVNANIAN COMMUNITIES, INC.; K. HOVNANIAN COMPANIES OF CALIFORNIA, INC. ON 05/23/2018

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY K. HOVNANIAN COMMUNITIES, INC.; K. HOVNANIAN COMPANIES OF CALIFORNIA, INC. ON 02/08/2018

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY K. HOVNANIAN COMMUNITIES, INC.; K. HOVNANIAN COMPANIES OF CALIFORNIA, INC. ON 02/08/2018

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY K. HOVNANIAN COMMUNITIES, INC.; K. HOVNANIAN COMPANIES OF CALIFORNIA, INC. ON 02/08/2018

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY K. HOVNANIAN COMMUNITIES, INC.; K. HOVNANIAN COMPANIES OF CALIFORNIA, INC. ON 02/08/2018

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY K. HOVNANIAN COMMUNITIES, INC.; K. HOVNANIAN COMPANIES OF CALIFORNIA, INC. ON 01/25/2018

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY K. HOVNANIAN COMMUNITIES, INC.; K. HOVNANIAN COMPANIES OF CALIFORNIA, INC. ON 01/25/2018

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 35 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - RESPONSE IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12278212 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12101952.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 35 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - RESPONSE IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12278212 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12101952.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 12/22/2017 01:37:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 12/22/2017 01:37:00 PM.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 35 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - RESPONSE IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12247835 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12071571.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 35 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - RESPONSE IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12247835 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12071571.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY K. HOVNANIAN COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 10/19/2017

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY K. HOVNANIAN COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 10/19/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY K. HOVNANIAN COMMUNITIES, INC.; K. HOVNANIAN COMPANIES OF CALIFORNIA, INC. ON 10/23/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY K. HOVNANIAN COMMUNITIES, INC.; K. HOVNANIAN COMPANIES OF CALIFORNIA, INC. ON 10/23/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY K. HOVNANIAN COMMUNITIES, INC.; K. HOVNANIAN COMPANIES OF CALIFORNIA, INC. ON 10/03/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY K. HOVNANIAN COMMUNITIES, INC.; K. HOVNANIAN COMPANIES OF CALIFORNIA, INC. ON 10/03/2017

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 34 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - PLAINTIFF IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12182109 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12005809.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 34 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - PLAINTIFF IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12182109 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12005809.

244 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL 01/03/2020 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER (OF PARTIAL DISMISSAL) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 12/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 12/03/2019 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketTHE COURT ORDERS PRODUCTION PLUS PLUMBING, INC. BE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE ON AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT(FIRST).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketTHE COURT ORDERS EMPIRE INSULATION, INC. BE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE ON CROSS-COMPLAINT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL CONTINUED TO 01/03/2020 AT 08:30 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT PURSUANT TO PARTY'S MOTION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketAMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT DISMISSAL- LACK OF PROSECUTION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketCROSS-COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT DISMISSAL- LACK OF PROSECUTION.

    Read MoreRead Less
380 More Docket Entries
  • 07/27/2017
  • DocketTHE COURT DEEMS THIS CASE EXCEPTIONAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 10/16/2017 AT 08:30:00 AM IN CX102 AT CIVIL COMPLEX CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2575855 RECEIVED ON 07/24/2017 04:21:52 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND RECEIPT FILED BY K. HOVNANIAN COMMUNITIES, INC.; K. HOVNANIAN COMPANIES OF CALIFORNIA, INC. ON 07/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 34 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - PLAINTIFF IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12182109 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12005809.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 4744362 RECEIVED ON 07/03/2017 01:01:41 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER CLASTER, WILLIAM ON 07/03/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY K. HOVNANIAN COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 07/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY K. HOVNANIAN COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 07/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY K. HOVNANIAN COMMUNITIES, INC.; K. HOVNANIAN COMPANIES OF CALIFORNIA, INC. ON 07/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MICKEY WALL PAINTING, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where DC Brown C&P, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where CLEARVIEW WINDOWS & DOORS, INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Ike's Landscape Inc is a litigant