This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 10/08/2020 at 06:57:04 (UTC).

JUMBLEBERRY ENTERPRISES USA, LTD. VS. NUTRI-BURN, LLC

Case Summary

On 05/26/2020 JUMBLEBERRY ENTERPRISES USA, LTD filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against NUTRI-BURN, LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Jumbleberry Enterprises USA, Ltd.

Respondents

Alberto Juarbe

Nutri-Burn, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, LLP

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY JUMBLEBERRY ENTERPRISES USA, LTD. ON 07/15/2020

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY JUMBLEBERRY ENTERPRISES USA, LTD. ON 07/15/2020

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 05/26/2020.

PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 05/26/2020.

DECLARATION - OTHER (OF DAMON W. D. WRIGHT) FILED BY JUMBLEBERRY ENTERPRISES USA, LTD. ON 05/26/2020

DECLARATION - OTHER (OF DAMON W. D. WRIGHT) FILED BY JUMBLEBERRY ENTERPRISES USA, LTD. ON 05/26/2020

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER UNASSIGNED ON 05/26/2020.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER UNASSIGNED ON 05/26/2020.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12736215 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12562514.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12736215 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12562514.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY JUMBLEBERRY ENTERPRISES USA, LTD. ON 05/26/2020

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY JUMBLEBERRY ENTERPRISES USA, LTD. ON 05/26/2020

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY JUMBLEBERRY ENTERPRISES USA, LTD. ON 05/26/2020

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY JUMBLEBERRY ENTERPRISES USA, LTD. ON 05/26/2020

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES RECEIVED ON 05/26/2020.

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES RECEIVED ON 05/26/2020.

PETITION - NEW CASE INITIATION FILED BY JUMBLEBERRY ENTERPRISES USA, LTD. ON 05/26/2020

PETITION - NEW CASE INITIATION FILED BY JUMBLEBERRY ENTERPRISES USA, LTD. ON 05/26/2020

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1751956 RECEIVED ON 07/15/2020 05:03:08 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY JUMBLEBERRY ENTERPRISES USA, LTD. ON 07/15/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketCASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketPETITION - NEW CASE INITIATION DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketPETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD SCHEDULED FOR 08/21/2020 AT 09:30:00 AM IN C16 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12736215 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12562514.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1734717 RECEIVED ON 03/30/2020 05:13:29 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 05/26/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION - OTHER (OF DAMON W. D. WRIGHT) FILED BY JUMBLEBERRY ENTERPRISES USA, LTD. ON 05/26/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER UNASSIGNED ON 05/26/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY JUMBLEBERRY ENTERPRISES USA, LTD. ON 05/26/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY JUMBLEBERRY ENTERPRISES USA, LTD. ON 05/26/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES RECEIVED ON 05/26/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY JUMBLEBERRY ENTERPRISES USA, LTD. ON 05/26/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION - NEW CASE INITIATION FILED BY JUMBLEBERRY ENTERPRISES USA, LTD. ON 05/26/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JUMBLEBERRY ENTERPRISES USA LTD. is a litigant