This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 06/14/2022 at 03:50:41 (UTC).

JULIO GONZALEZ VS. GONZALEZ MANAGEMENT COMPANY, INC.

Case Summary

On 04/01/2022 JULIO GONZALEZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against GONZALEZ MANAGEMENT COMPANY, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, West Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-WJC

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Julio Gonzalez

Defendants

Gonzalez Management Company, Inc.

Vallarta Food Enterprises, Inc.

Jalos Food Enterprises Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mandell Trial Lawyers

Defendant Attorney

Floyd Skeren Manukian Langevin, LLP

 

Court Documents

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/09/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN W08 AT WEST JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/09/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN W08 AT WEST JUSTICE CENTER.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13029337 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12857334.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13029337 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12857334.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY GONZALEZ, JULIO ON 04/01/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY GONZALEZ, JULIO ON 04/01/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY GONZALEZ, JULIO ON 04/01/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY GONZALEZ, JULIO ON 04/01/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY GONZALEZ, JULIO ON 04/01/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY GONZALEZ, JULIO ON 04/01/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY GONZALEZ, JULIO ON 04/13/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY GONZALEZ, JULIO ON 04/13/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY GONZALEZ, JULIO ON 04/13/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY GONZALEZ, JULIO ON 04/13/2022

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13051985 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12880001.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13051985 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12880001.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY JALOS FOOD ENTERPRISES INC. ON 05/20/2022

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY JALOS FOOD ENTERPRISES INC. ON 05/20/2022

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2022
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: SCHWARM; Department: W08

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1991094 RECEIVED ON 05/20/2022 11:15:12 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY JALOS FOOD ENTERPRISES INC. ON 05/20/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13051985 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12880001.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1975354 RECEIVED ON 04/13/2022 09:21:18 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY GONZALEZ, JULIO ON 04/13/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31143655 RECEIVED ON 04/13/2022 09:21:23 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY GONZALEZ, JULIO ON 04/13/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1970767 RECEIVED ON 04/01/2022 09:05:35 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13029337 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12857334.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/09/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN W08 AT WEST JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY GONZALEZ, JULIO ON 04/01/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY GONZALEZ, JULIO ON 04/01/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY GONZALEZ, JULIO ON 04/01/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SCHWARM, WALTER ON 04/01/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Gonzalez Management Company is a litigant

Latest cases where VALLARTA FOOD ENTERPRISES INC. is a litigant