This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 03/31/2017 at 00:14:24 (UTC).

JULIO DURAN VS. SHELLY BMW CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 08/12/2013 JULIO DURAN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SHELLY BMW CORPORATION. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, North Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-NJC

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JULIO DURAN

Defendant

SHELLY BMW CORPORATION

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2013
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF JUDGMENT CONTESTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2013
  • DISPOSITION FOR DURAN, JULIO ON PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT VACATED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2013
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF JUDGMENT CONTESTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2013
  • SUBPOENA RECORDS SENT TO THE BAR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2013
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF JUDGMENT CONTESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2013
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF JUDGMENT CONTESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2013
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY (SMALL CLAIMS) FILED BY SHELLY BMW CORPORATION ON 10/08/2013; Filing Party: SHELLY BMW CORPORATIO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2013
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL 10/08/2013 01:30:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2013
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT - PERSONAL FILED BY DURAN, JULIO ON 09/23/2013; Filing Party: DURAN, JULIO ON 09/23/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 03 - SMALL CLAIMS $1,500 OR LESS IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11430280 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11254152.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 10/08/2013 AT 01:30:00 PM IN N10 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT FILED BY DURAN, JULIO ON 08/12/2013; Filing Party: DURAN, JULIO ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less