This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/20/2018 at 19:28:48 (UTC).

JULIO C GARCIA VS. JUAN ERIK RAYA

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 JULIO C GARCIA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JUAN ERIK RAYA. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, North Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-NJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JULIO C GARCIA

Defendant

JUAN ERIK RAYA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2017
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR 10/12/2017 01:30:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • STIPULATION TO PAY JUDGMENT IN INSTALLMENTS FILED BY GARCIA, JULIO C; RAYA, JUAN ERIK ON 10/12/2017; Filing Party: GARCIA, JULIO C; RAYA, JUAN ERIK ON 10/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (OJD) FILED BY GARCIA, JULIO C ON 09/27/2017; Filing Party: GARCIA, JULIO C ON 09/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR SCHEDULED FOR 10/12/2017 AT 01:30:00 PM IN N10 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER TO PRODUCE STATEMENT OF ASSETS AND TO APPEAR FOR EXAMINATION FILED BY GARCIA, JULIO C ON 08/31/2017; Filing Party: GARCIA, JULIO C ON 08/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR 08/31/2017 01:30:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR SMALL CLAIMS FEE WAIVER HEARING 08/03/2017 01:30:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • GARCIA, JULIO C REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES GRANTED IN WHOLE ON 08/03/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES GRANTED IN WHOLE ON 08/03/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER AFTER HEARING (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 08/03/2017; Filing Party: THE

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 08/10/2016
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL 08/10/2016 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY GARCIA, JULIO C ON 07/20/2016; Filing Party: GARCIA, JULIO C ON 07/20/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 08/10/2016 AT 08:30:00 AM IN N10 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2016
  • ORDER ON REQUEST TO POSTPONE SMALL CLAIMS HEARINGS FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 06/03/2016; Filing Party: THE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2016
  • REQUEST FOR RESET OF SMALL CLAIMS HEARING FILED BY GARCIA, JULIO C ON 06/01/2016; Filing Party: GARCIA, JULIO C ON 06/01/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 06/14/2016 AT 08:30:00 AM IN N10 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2016
  • REQUEST FOR RESET OF SMALL CLAIMS HEARING FILED BY GARCIA, JULIO C ON 04/08/2016; Filing Party: GARCIA, JULIO C ON 04/08/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY GARCIA ROJAS, JULIO FOR 05 - SMALL CLAIMS >$5,000<=$10,000 IN THE AMOUNT OF 75.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927386 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751611.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 04/19/2016 AT 08:30:00 AM IN N10 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT FILED BY GARCIA, JULIO C ON 02/26/2016; Filing Party: GARCIA, JULIO C ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.