This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/12/2019 at 11:38:40 (UTC).

JULIE HAWK VS. EMBASSY SUITES BY HILTON BREA NORTH ORANGE COUNTY

Case Summary

On 08/21/2018 JULIE HAWK filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against EMBASSY SUITES BY HILTON BREA NORTH ORANGE COUNTY. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    08/21/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JULIE HAWK

Defendants and Others

ISAAC QUINTANILLA

ARMORED GROUP INTERNATIONAL, INC.

EMBASSY SUITES BY HILTON BREA NORTH ORANGE COUNTY

Brea OPCO LLC

Interested Party

William M. Crosby

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

WILLIAM M. CROSBY

Downtown LA Law Group

Defendant and Other Attorneys

TYSON & MENDES

BREMER WHYTE BROWN & O'MEARA, LLP

Wood, Smith, Henning & Berman LLP

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY QUINTANILLA, ISAAC; ARMORED GROUP INTERNATIONAL, INC. ON 08/06/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY QUINTANILLA, ISAAC; ARMORED GROUP INTERNATIONAL, INC. ON 08/06/2019

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY HAWK, JULIE ON 06/13/2019

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY HAWK, JULIE ON 06/13/2019

NOTICE - OTHER (OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY) FILED BY BREA OPCO LLC ON 05/30/2019

NOTICE - OTHER (OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY) FILED BY BREA OPCO LLC ON 05/30/2019

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT FILED BY HAWK, JULIE ON 02/01/2019

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT FILED BY HAWK, JULIE ON 02/01/2019

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 02/01/2019 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 02/01/2019 09:00:00 AM.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY HAWK, JULIE ON 12/28/2018

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY HAWK, JULIE ON 12/28/2018

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (INCORRECT NAME) RECEIVED ON 01/16/2019.

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (INCORRECT NAME) RECEIVED ON 01/16/2019.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY ARMORED GROUP INTERNATIONAL, INC. ON 01/17/2019

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY ARMORED GROUP INTERNATIONAL, INC. ON 01/17/2019

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY HAWK, JULIE ON 01/15/2019

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY HAWK, JULIE ON 01/15/2019

NOTICE OF LIEN FILED BY CROSBY, WILLIAM M. ON 12/28/2018

NOTICE OF LIEN FILED BY CROSBY, WILLIAM M. ON 12/28/2018

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY BREA OPCO LLC ON 01/10/2019

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY BREA OPCO LLC ON 01/10/2019

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3741177 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3741177 REJECTED.

ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY ARMORED GROUP INTERNATIONAL, INC. ON 12/19/2018

ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY ARMORED GROUP INTERNATIONAL, INC. ON 12/19/2018

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY BREA OPCO LLC ON 12/19/2018

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY BREA OPCO LLC ON 12/19/2018

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY BREA OPCO LLC ON 12/19/2018

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY BREA OPCO LLC ON 12/19/2018

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FIRSTLEGALNETWORK FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12474651 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12298330.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FIRSTLEGALNETWORK FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12474651 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12298330.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY BREA OPCO LLC ON 12/19/2018

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY BREA OPCO LLC ON 12/19/2018

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY HAWK, JULIE ON 12/18/2018

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY HAWK, JULIE ON 12/18/2018

44 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY QUINTANILLA, ISAAC; ARMORED GROUP INTERNATIONAL, INC. ON 08/06/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 4998730 RECEIVED ON 08/06/2019 04:44:01 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY HAWK, JULIE ON 06/13/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3802246 RECEIVED ON 06/13/2019 04:49:36 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - OTHER (OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY) FILED BY BREA OPCO LLC ON 05/30/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2799852 RECEIVED ON 05/30/2019 09:05:01 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT FILED BY HAWK, JULIE ON 02/01/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 02/01/2019 09:00:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • DocketTHE MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR 01/31/2020 AT 08:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT C12.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • DocketTHE JURY TRIAL IS SCHEDULED FOR 03/02/2020 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT C12.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
72 More Docket Entries
  • 09/24/2018
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 4889955 RECEIVED ON 09/24/2018 10:49:44 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 12/14/2018 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C12 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY HAWK, JULIE ON 09/17/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 4887900 RECEIVED ON 09/17/2018 05:44:35 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER MELZER, LAYNE ON 08/21/2018.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12406246 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12229976.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY HAWK, JULIE ON 08/21/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY HAWK, JULIE ON 08/21/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY HAWK, JULIE ON 08/21/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 4879016 RECEIVED ON 08/21/2018 04:52:00 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less