This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/09/2019 at 05:12:06 (UTC).

JULIE CHONG VS. JOHN CHENG

Case Summary

On 06/08/2017 JULIE CHONG filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against JOHN CHENG. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Minors

ETHAN CHONG

JORDAN CHONG

JULIE CHONG

Defendant

JOHN CHENG

Plaintiff and Guardian Ad Litem

JULIE CHONG

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Minor Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF DAVID P CRANDALL

CHRISTINE CHONG

JULIE CHONG

 

Court Documents

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 12/18/2017 08:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 12/18/2017 08:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 11/06/2017 08:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 11/06/2017 08:30:00 AM.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY CHONG, ETHAN; CHONG, JORDAN; CHONG, JULIE ON 11/06/2017

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY CHONG, ETHAN; CHONG, JORDAN; CHONG, JULIE ON 11/06/2017

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY CHONG, JULIE ON 11/03/2017

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY CHONG, JULIE ON 11/03/2017

NOTICE OF HEARING OC GENERATED

NOTICE OF HEARING OC GENERATED

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 08/16/2017 02:38:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 08/16/2017 02:38:00 PM.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 01/08/2018 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C23 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 01/08/2018 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C23 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGAL CONNECT FOR OTHER TRUST IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12177155 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12000850.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGAL CONNECT FOR OTHER TRUST IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12177155 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12000850.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGAL CONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12177118 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12000813.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGAL CONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12177118 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12000813.

NOTICE OF FEES DUE ELECTRONIC FILING

NOTICE OF FEES DUE ELECTRONIC FILING

PAYMENT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12168704 IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00 VOIDED DUE TO OTHER.

PAYMENT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12168704 IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00 VOIDED DUE TO OTHER.

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FILED BY CHONG, JULIE ON 06/20/2017

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FILED BY CHONG, JULIE ON 06/20/2017

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FILED BY CHONG, JULIE ON 06/20/2017

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FILED BY CHONG, JULIE ON 06/20/2017

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CHONG, JULIE ON 06/20/2017

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CHONG, JULIE ON 06/20/2017

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER HUNT, DEREK ON 06/08/2017.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER HUNT, DEREK ON 06/08/2017.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12168704 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11992404.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12168704 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11992404.

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 12/18/2017 08:30:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • COURT ORDERS THE ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT DISMISSAL- LACK OF PROSECUTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT DISMISSAL- LACK OF PROSECUTION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 11/06/2017 08:30:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL IS SCHEDULED FOR 12/18/2017 AT 08:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT C23.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE CONTINUED TO 12/18/2017 AT 08:30 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT PURSUANT TO PARTY'S MOTION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL SCHEDULED FOR 12/18/2017 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C23 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 12/18/2017 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C23 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 06/20/2017
  • CHONG, JULIE APPOINTED AS GUARDIAN AD LITEM CR .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FILED BY CHONG, JULIE ON 06/20/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FILED BY CHONG, JULIE ON 06/20/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CHONG, JULIE ON 06/20/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4740179 RECEIVED ON 06/20/2017 10:27:08 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER HUNT, DEREK ON 06/08/2017.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12168704 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11992404.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CHONG, JULIE ON 06/08/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY CHONG, JULIE; CHONG, ETHAN; CHONG, JORDAN ON 06/08/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3554605 RECEIVED ON 06/08/2017 02:54:38 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less