Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 03/22/2020 at 22:30:33 (UTC).

JULIE A. KILDUFF VS. MESA VISTA NORTH TOWNHOMES OWNERS ASSOCIATION

Case Summary

On 05/21/2018 JULIE A KILDUFF filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against MESA VISTA NORTH TOWNHOMES OWNERS ASSOCIATION. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    05/21/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JULIE A. KILDUFF AS TRUSTEE OF HER SUCCESSORS IN TRUST UNDER THE JULIE A. KILDUFF REVOCABLE TRUST DATED AUGUST 19, 2005 AND ANY AMENDMENTS THERETO

JULIE A. KILDUFF

JULIE A. KILDUFF AS TRUSTEE OF HER SUC

Defendants

MESA VISTA NORTH TOWNHOMES OWNERS ASSOCIATION

MESA VISTA NORTH TOWNHOMES OWNERS ASSO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SERGE TOMASSIAN

TOMASSIAN, THROCKMORTON & INOUYE LLP

Defendant Attorneys

HARTSUYKER, STRATMAN & WILLIAMS-ABREGO

Feldsott Lee Pagano & Canfield

 

Court Documents

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 03/26/2019

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 03/26/2019

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY MESA VISTA NORTH TOWNHOMES OWNERS ASSOCIATION ON 07/30/2018

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY MESA VISTA NORTH TOWNHOMES OWNERS ASSOCIATION ON 07/30/2018

COMPLAINT FILED BY KILDUFF, JULIE A.; JULIE A. KILDUFF AS TRUSTEE OF HER SUCCESSORS IN TRUST UNDER THE JULIE A. KILDUFF REVOCABLE TRUST DATED AUGUST 19, 2005 AND ANY AMENDMENTS THERETO ON 05/21/2018

COMPLAINT FILED BY KILDUFF, JULIE A.; JULIE A. KILDUFF AS TRUSTEE OF HER SUCCESSORS IN TRUST UNDER THE JULIE A. KILDUFF REVOCABLE TRUST DATED AUGUST 19, 2005 AND ANY AMENDMENTS THERETO ON 05/21/2018

PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY KILDUFF, JULIE A. ON 03/05/2020

PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY KILDUFF, JULIE A. ON 03/05/2020

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE 01/24/2020 08:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE 01/24/2020 08:30:00 AM.

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY KILDUFF, JULIE A. ON 01/23/2020

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY KILDUFF, JULIE A. ON 01/23/2020

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 10/17/2019

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 10/17/2019

PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY KILDUFF, JULIE A. ON 07/30/2019

PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY KILDUFF, JULIE A. ON 07/30/2019

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY MESA VISTA NORTH TOWNHOMES OWNERS ASSOCIATION ON 05/31/2019

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY MESA VISTA NORTH TOWNHOMES OWNERS ASSOCIATION ON 05/31/2019

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 03/27/2019 08:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 03/27/2019 08:30:00 AM.

EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY MESA VISTA NORTH TOWNHOMES OWNERS ASSOCIATION ON 03/25/2019

EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY MESA VISTA NORTH TOWNHOMES OWNERS ASSOCIATION ON 03/25/2019

PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY JULIE A. KILDUFF AS TRUSTEE OF HER SUCCESSORS IN TRUST UNDER THE JULIE A. KILDUFF REVOCABLE TRUST DATED AUGUST 19, 2005 AND ANY AMENDMENTS THERETO ON 09/21/2018

PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY JULIE A. KILDUFF AS TRUSTEE OF HER SUCCESSORS IN TRUST UNDER THE JULIE A. KILDUFF REVOCABLE TRUST DATED AUGUST 19, 2005 AND ANY AMENDMENTS THERETO ON 09/21/2018

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY JULIE A. KILDUFF AS TRUSTEE OF HER SUCCESSORS IN TRUST UNDER THE JULIE A. KILDUFF REVOCABLE TRUST DATED AUGUST 19, 2005 AND ANY AMENDMENTS THERETO ON 09/21/2018

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY JULIE A. KILDUFF AS TRUSTEE OF HER SUCCESSORS IN TRUST UNDER THE JULIE A. KILDUFF REVOCABLE TRUST DATED AUGUST 19, 2005 AND ANY AMENDMENTS THERETO ON 09/21/2018

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12420456 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12244166.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12420456 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12244166.

PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY JULIE A. KILDUFF AS TRUSTEE OF HER SUCCESSORS IN TRUST UNDER THE JULIE A. KILDUFF REVOCABLE TRUST DATED AUGUST 19, 2005 AND ANY AMENDMENTS THERETO ON 09/18/2018

PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY JULIE A. KILDUFF AS TRUSTEE OF HER SUCCESSORS IN TRUST UNDER THE JULIE A. KILDUFF REVOCABLE TRUST DATED AUGUST 19, 2005 AND ANY AMENDMENTS THERETO ON 09/18/2018

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY JULIE A. KILDUFF AS TRUSTEE OF HER SUCCESSORS IN TRUST UNDER THE JULIE A. KILDUFF REVOCABLE TRUST DATED AUGUST 19, 2005 AND ANY AMENDMENTS THERETO ON 09/06/2018

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY JULIE A. KILDUFF AS TRUSTEE OF HER SUCCESSORS IN TRUST UNDER THE JULIE A. KILDUFF REVOCABLE TRUST DATED AUGUST 19, 2005 AND ANY AMENDMENTS THERETO ON 09/06/2018

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER CRANDALL, JAMES ON 05/21/2018.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER CRANDALL, JAMES ON 05/21/2018.

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2020
  • HearingDescription: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE; Judge: CRANDALL; Department: C33

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY KILDUFF, JULIE A. ON 03/05/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - OTHER FILED BY KILDUFF, JULIE A. ON 03/05/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41074346 RECEIVED ON 03/05/2020 06:11:11 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 01/28/2020 10:54:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketTHE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE IS SCHEDULED FOR 06/01/2020 AT 08:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT C33.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE SCHEDULED FOR 06/01/2020 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C33 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE 01/24/2020 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY KILDUFF, JULIE A. ON 01/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
65 More Docket Entries
  • 08/02/2018
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1524555 RECEIVED ON 07/30/2018 10:09:54 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY MESA VISTA NORTH TOWNHOMES OWNERS ASSOCIATION ON 07/30/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY MESA VISTA NORTH TOWNHOMES OWNERS ASSOCIATION ON 07/30/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/19/2018 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C33 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12354465 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12178212.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 4848151 RECEIVED ON 05/21/2018 05:18:23 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER CRANDALL, JAMES ON 05/21/2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY KILDUFF, JULIE A.; JULIE A. KILDUFF AS TRUSTEE OF HER SUCCESSORS IN TRUST UNDER THE JULIE A. KILDUFF REVOCABLE TRUST DATED AUGUST 19, 2005 AND ANY AMENDMENTS THERETO ON 05/21/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY KILDUFF, JULIE A.; JULIE A. KILDUFF AS TRUSTEE OF HER SUCCESSORS IN TRUST UNDER THE JULIE A. KILDUFF REVOCABLE TRUST DATED AUGUST 19, 2005 AND ANY AMENDMENTS THERETO ON 05/21/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY KILDUFF, JULIE A.; JULIE A. KILDUFF AS TRUSTEE OF HER SUCCESSORS IN TRUST UNDER THE JULIE A. KILDUFF REVOCABLE TRUST DATED AUGUST 19, 2005 AND ANY AMENDMENTS THERETO ON 05/21/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HER LLC is a litigant