This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/10/2019 at 03:27:49 (UTC).

JUDITH ENGELHARDT VS. HAIDER SIKANDER

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 JUDITH ENGELHARDT filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against HAIDER SIKANDER. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CASSELL ENGELHARDT

JUDITH ENGELHARDT

Defendant

HAIDER SIKANDER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GLEN LERNER INJURY ATTORNEYS

Defendant Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF FRANCINE B. KELLY & ASSOCIATES

Other Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF FRANCINE B. KELLY & ASS

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY ENGELHARDT, JUDITH; ENGELHARDT, CASSELL ON 10/10/2017

COMPLAINT FILED BY ENGELHARDT, JUDITH; ENGELHARDT, CASSELL ON 10/10/2017

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12234201 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12057880.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12234201 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12057880.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ENGELHARDT, JUDITH; ENGELHARDT, CASSELL ON 10/10/2017

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ENGELHARDT, JUDITH; ENGELHARDT, CASSELL ON 10/10/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY ENGELHARDT, CASSELL; ENGELHARDT, JUDITH ON 12/05/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY ENGELHARDT, CASSELL; ENGELHARDT, JUDITH ON 12/05/2017

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY SIKANDER, HAIDER ON 11/28/2017

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY SIKANDER, HAIDER ON 11/28/2017

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY ENGELHARDT, CASSELL; ENGELHARDT, JUDITH ON 11/27/2017

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY ENGELHARDT, CASSELL; ENGELHARDT, JUDITH ON 11/27/2017

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY ENGELHARDT, CASSELL; ENGELHARDT, JUDITH ON 02/08/2018

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY ENGELHARDT, CASSELL; ENGELHARDT, JUDITH ON 02/08/2018

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ENGELHARDT, JUDITH; ENGELHARDT, CASSELL ON 10/10/2017

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ENGELHARDT, JUDITH; ENGELHARDT, CASSELL ON 10/10/2017

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12259689 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12083395.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12259689 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12083395.

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY SIKANDER, HAIDER ON 11/28/2017

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY SIKANDER, HAIDER ON 11/28/2017

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 02/09/2018 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C21 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 02/09/2018 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C21 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY ENGELHARDT, JUDITH; ENGELHARDT, CASSELL ON 04/12/2018

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY ENGELHARDT, JUDITH; ENGELHARDT, CASSELL ON 04/12/2018

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY ENGELHARDT, CASSELL; ENGELHARDT, JUDITH ON 02/08/2018

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY ENGELHARDT, CASSELL; ENGELHARDT, JUDITH ON 02/08/2018

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY SIKANDER, HAIDER ON 02/02/2018

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY SIKANDER, HAIDER ON 02/02/2018

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12293485 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12117253.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12293485 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12117253.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SERVINO, DEBORAH ON 10/10/2017.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SERVINO, DEBORAH ON 10/10/2017.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY SIKANDER, HAIDER ON 02/02/2018

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY SIKANDER, HAIDER ON 02/02/2018

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 02/09/2018 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 02/09/2018 09:00:00 AM.

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2018
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY ENGELHARDT, JUDITH; ENGELHARDT, CASSELL ON 04/12/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3656430 RECEIVED ON 04/12/2018 04:02:30 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 02/09/2018 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE IS SCHEDULED FOR 04/13/2018 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT C21.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE SCHEDULED FOR 04/13/2018 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C21 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY ENGELHARDT, CASSELL; ENGELHARDT, JUDITH ON 02/08/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3634906 RECEIVED ON 02/08/2018 04:10:39 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY ENGELHARDT, CASSELL; ENGELHARDT, JUDITH ON 02/08/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 11/29/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1444674 RECEIVED ON 11/28/2017 04:07:36 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY ENGELHARDT, CASSELL; ENGELHARDT, JUDITH ON 11/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4790689 RECEIVED ON 11/27/2017 01:17:53 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 02/09/2018 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C21 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SERVINO, DEBORAH ON 10/10/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12234201 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12057880.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ENGELHARDT, JUDITH; ENGELHARDT, CASSELL ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ENGELHARDT, JUDITH; ENGELHARDT, CASSELL ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY ENGELHARDT, JUDITH; ENGELHARDT, CASSELL ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3595977 RECEIVED ON 10/10/2017 04:12:35 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.