This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 03/07/2019 at 08:22:01 (UTC).

JUANA RIOS VS PABLO RIOS

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 JUANA RIOS filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against PABLO RIOS. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1682

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lamoreaux Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

RIOS, JUANA

Respondent

RIOS, PABLO

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/27/2016
  • DECLARATION - DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT 10/27/2016; Filing Party: RIOS, JUANA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2016
  • JUDGMENT - DISSOLUTION 10/27/2016; Filing Party: RIOS, JUANA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2016
  • NOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 10/27/2016; Filing Party: RIOS, JUANA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2016
  • DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 10/27/2016; Filing Party: RIOS, JUANA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2016
  • MINUTE ORDER 10/27/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2016
  • HEARING - DISSOLUTION - UNCONTESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2016
  • MEMORANDUM - SET HEARING 07/08/2016; Filing Party: RIOS, JUANA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2016
  • PROPERTY DECLARATION - SEPARATE 07/07/2016; Filing Party: RIOS, JUANA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2016
  • PROPERTY DECLARATION - SEPARATE 07/07/2016; Filing Party: RIOS, JUANA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2016
  • INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 07/07/2016; Filing Party: RIOS, JUANA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2016
  • DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 07/07/2016; Filing Party: RIOS, JUANA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2016
  • REQUEST - ENTER DEFAULT 07/07/2016; Filing Party: RIOS, JUANA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 05/02/2016; Filing Party: RIOS, JUANA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • NOTICE - PAYMENT - APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES 03/02/2016; Filing Party: RIOS, JUANA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • ORDER - FEE WAIVER DENIED - PAYMENT(S) ORDERED 02/26/2016; Filing Party: RIOS, JUANA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • REQUEST - WAIVE COURT FEES 02/26/2016 5C SENT TO L64; Filing Party: RIOS, JUANA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • PROPERTY DECLARATION - SEPARATE 02/26/2016; Filing Party: RIOS, JUANA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 02/26/2016; Filing Party: RIOS, JUANA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • SUMMONS 02/26/2016; Filing Party: RIOS, JUANA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • PETITION - DISSOLUTION 02/26/2016 Amount:$435.00; Filing Party: RIOS, JUANA

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.