This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 01/18/2023 at 07:29:32 (UTC).

JUANA GONZALEZ VS. ONESOURCE DISTRIBUTORS, LLC

Case Summary

On 08/02/2022 JUANA GONZALEZ filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against ONESOURCE DISTRIBUTORS, LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County West Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-WJC

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JUANA GONZALEZ

Defendants

ONESOURCE DISTRIBUTORS, LLC

Sonepar Distribution New England, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Leslie Glyer Law, P.C.

Defendant Attorney

Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak, & Stewart, P.C.

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE

NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE FILED BY ONESOURCE DISTRIBUTORS, LLC; SONEPAR DISTRIBUTION NEW ENGLAND, INC. ON 01/09/2023

NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE FILED BY ONESOURCE DISTRIBUTORS, LLC; SONEPAR DISTRIBUTION NEW ENGLAND, INC. ON 01/09/2023

CONSENT TO ELECTRONIC SERVICE AND NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE ADDRESS FILED BY ONESOURCE DISTRIBUTORS, LLC ON 01/09/2023

CONSENT TO ELECTRONIC SERVICE AND NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE ADDRESS FILED BY ONESOURCE DISTRIBUTORS, LLC ON 01/09/2023

CONSENT TO ELECTRONIC SERVICE AND NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE ADDRESS FILED BY SONEPAR DISTRIBUTION NEW ENGLAND, INC. ON 01/09/2023

CONSENT TO ELECTRONIC SERVICE AND NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE ADDRESS FILED BY SONEPAR DISTRIBUTION NEW ENGLAND, INC. ON 01/09/2023

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY GONZALEZ, JUANA ON 01/09/2023

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY GONZALEZ, JUANA ON 01/09/2023

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY ONESOURCE DISTRIBUTORS, LLC; SONEPAR DISTRIBUTION NEW ENGLAND, INC. ON 01/09/2023

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY ONESOURCE DISTRIBUTORS, LLC; SONEPAR DISTRIBUTION NEW ENGLAND, INC. ON 01/09/2023

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 12/23/2022 08:28:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 12/23/2022 08:28:00 AM.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13154441 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12982538.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13154441 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12982538.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY GONZALEZ, JUANA ON 12/21/2022

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY GONZALEZ, JUANA ON 12/21/2022

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY GONZALEZ, JUANA ON 12/21/2022

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY GONZALEZ, JUANA ON 12/21/2022

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY ONESOURCE DISTRIBUTORS, LLC; SONEPAR DISTRIBUTION NEW ENGLAND, INC. ON 12/21/2022

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY ONESOURCE DISTRIBUTORS, LLC; SONEPAR DISTRIBUTION NEW ENGLAND, INC. ON 12/21/2022

CASE REASSIGNED TO SHEILA RECIO EFFECTIVE 01/09/2023.

CASE REASSIGNED TO SHEILA RECIO EFFECTIVE 01/09/2023.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13104284 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12932286.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13104284 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12932286.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13103996 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12931998.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13103996 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12931998.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY GONZALEZ, JUANA ON 08/15/2022

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY GONZALEZ, JUANA ON 08/15/2022

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2023
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: RECIO; Department: W08

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONTINUANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 02/06/2023 AT 10:00:00 AM IN W08 AT WEST JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41432052 RECEIVED ON 01/09/2023 09:36:02 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE FILED BY ONESOURCE DISTRIBUTORS, LLC; SONEPAR DISTRIBUTION NEW ENGLAND, INC. ON 01/09/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONSENT TO ELECTRONIC SERVICE AND NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE ADDRESS FILED BY ONESOURCE DISTRIBUTORS, LLC ON 01/09/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 11085833 RECEIVED ON 01/09/2023 09:28:53 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONSENT TO ELECTRONIC SERVICE AND NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE ADDRESS FILED BY SONEPAR DISTRIBUTION NEW ENGLAND, INC. ON 01/09/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41432047 RECEIVED ON 01/09/2023 09:31:13 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY GONZALEZ, JUANA ON 01/09/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21196487 RECEIVED ON 08/15/2022 02:53:16 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY GONZALEZ, JUANA ON 08/15/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41372104 RECEIVED ON 08/15/2022 02:53:16 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 01/05/2023 AT 08:30:00 AM IN N06 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SALTER, GLENN ON 08/02/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13085978 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12913968.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY GONZALEZ, JUANA ON 08/02/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY GONZALEZ, JUANA ON 08/02/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY GONZALEZ, JUANA ON 08/02/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 11020581 RECEIVED ON 08/02/2022 02:37:49 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less