This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 11:46:08 (UTC).

JUAN RECENDIZ VS. JOHN AND LYNNE YEGENIAN, INC.

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 JUAN RECENDIZ filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against JOHN AND LYNNE YEGENIAN, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

EVARISTO WENCES BAHENA

JUAN RECENDIZ

CARLOS RAMIREZ URBANO

SUE KUE

Defendant

JOHN AND LYNNE YEGENIAN, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF FARRAH MIRABEL

Defendant Attorney

KADING BRIGGS LLP

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY RECENDIZ, JUAN; KUE, SUE; BAHENA, EVARISTO WENCES; URBANO, CARLOS RAMIREZ ON 02/26/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY RECENDIZ, JUAN; KUE, SUE; BAHENA, EVARISTO WENCES; URBANO, CARLOS RAMIREZ ON 02/26/2016

NOTICE OF HEARING (OF MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE) FILED BY JOHN AND LYNNE YEGENIAN, INC. ON 03/10/2017

NOTICE OF HEARING (OF MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE) FILED BY JOHN AND LYNNE YEGENIAN, INC. ON 03/10/2017

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12185295 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12008995.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12185295 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12008995.

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 05/06/2016

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 05/06/2016

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT 10/11/2016 01:30:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT 10/11/2016 01:30:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 01/13/2017 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 01/13/2017 09:00:00 AM.

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY JOHN AND LYNNE YEGENIAN, INC. ON 11/16/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY JOHN AND LYNNE YEGENIAN, INC. ON 11/16/2017

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY JOHN AND LYNNE YEGENIAN, INC. ON 12/30/2016

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY JOHN AND LYNNE YEGENIAN, INC. ON 12/30/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11968570 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11792726.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11968570 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11792726.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY JOHN AND LYNNE YEGENIAN, INC. ON 07/18/2016

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY JOHN AND LYNNE YEGENIAN, INC. ON 07/18/2016

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 07/06/2017 04:05:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 07/06/2017 04:05:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 09/02/2016 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 09/02/2016 09:00:00 AM.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12202171 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12025897.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12202171 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12025897.

SEPARATE STATEMENT FILED BY URBANO, CARLOS RAMIREZ ON 01/16/2018

SEPARATE STATEMENT FILED BY URBANO, CARLOS RAMIREZ ON 01/16/2018

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY JOHN AND LYNNE YEGENIAN, INC. ON 05/05/2016

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY JOHN AND LYNNE YEGENIAN, INC. ON 05/05/2016

DECLARATION RE: EX-PARTE NOTICE FILED BY JOHN AND LYNNE YEGENIAN, INC. ON 02/08/2018

DECLARATION RE: EX-PARTE NOTICE FILED BY JOHN AND LYNNE YEGENIAN, INC. ON 02/08/2018

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY JOHN AND LYNNE YEGENIAN, INC. ON 12/30/2016

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY JOHN AND LYNNE YEGENIAN, INC. ON 12/30/2016

EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY JOHN AND LYNNE YEGENIAN, INC. ON 02/08/2018

EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY JOHN AND LYNNE YEGENIAN, INC. ON 02/08/2018

107 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2018
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • AMENDED COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY BAHENA, EVARISTO WENCES; KUE, SUE; RECENDIZ, JUAN; URBANO, CARLOS RAMIREZ ON 04/06/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2658308 RECEIVED ON 04/06/2018 04:12:05 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12303460 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12127200.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION AND ORDER (RE: TRIAL DATE AND STATUS CONFERENCE) FILED BY JOHN AND LYNNE YEGENIAN, INC. ON 02/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1466997 RECEIVED ON 02/08/2018 09:18:35 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 02/09/2018 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • THE STATUS CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR 04/13/2018 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT C19.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • STATUS CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 04/13/2018 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C19 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
189 More Docket Entries
  • 05/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 05/06/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 05/06/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 05/05/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 07/08/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C19 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SCHWARM, WALTER ON 02/26/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11928297 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11752515.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY RECENDIZ, JUAN; KUE, SUE; BAHENA, EVARISTO WENCES; URBANO, CARLOS RAMIREZ ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY RECENDIZ, JUAN; KUE, SUE; BAHENA, EVARISTO WENCES; URBANO, CARLOS RAMIREZ ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY RECENDIZ, JUAN; KUE, SUE; BAHENA, EVARISTO WENCES; URBANO, CARLOS RAMIREZ ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4509974 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 09:26:14 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less